EP0900319 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR SEPARATION OF PIPES OR COLUMNS FIXED IN THE GROUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2002 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.04.2002 [2002/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wirth Maschinen- und Bohrgeräte-Fabrik GmbH Kölner Strasse 71-78 41812 Erkelenz / DE | [1999/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEINRICHS, Peter Auf dem Kirchkamp 83 D-41844 Wegberg / DE | 02 /
TIBUSSEK, Fritz Kaldenkirchener Strasse 6c D-41063 Mönchengladbach / DE | [1999/10] | Representative(s) | Kluin, Jörg-Eden, et al König-Palgen-Schumacher-Kluin Patentanwälte Lohengrinstrasse 11 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/10] | Kluin, Jörg-Eden, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al Palgen, Schumacher & Kluin Patentanwälte Mulvanystrasse 2 40239 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 97925854.8 | 21.05.1997 | [1999/10] | WO1997DE01017 | Priority number, date | DE1996120756 | 23.05.1996 Original published format: DE 19620756 | [1999/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9744566 | Date: | 27.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0900319 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0900319 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | E21B29/00, E21B29/12 | [1999/10] | CPC: |
E21B29/12 (EP,US);
E21B29/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1999/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ABTRENNEN VON IM BODEN VERANKERTEN ROHREN ODER PFEILERN | [1999/10] | English: | PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR SEPARATION OF PIPES OR COLUMNS FIXED IN THE GROUND | [1999/10] | French: | PROCECE ET DISPOSITIF POUR DECOUPER DES TUBES OU DES PILIERS ANCRES DANS LE SOL | [1999/10] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.10.1998 | Examination requested [1999/10] | 06.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0481767 (RED BARON OIL TOOLS RENTAL [GB]) [A] 1-11 * column 3, line 31 - line 45; figure 1 *; | [A]US4389765 (THOMPSON JR FLOYD M) [A] 1,4,12-14 * column W *; | [A]GB2211446 (HOUSTON ENGINEERS INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US4039025 (BURKHARDT JOSEPH A, et al) [A] 1,4 * figure - *; | [A]US2991834 (KENNARD THOMAS A) [A] 1,4 * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 15; figure - *; | [A]WO9319281 (ATLANTIC RICHFIELD CO [US]); | [A]GB2251015 (SMITH INTERNATIONAL [US]); | [A]US1755206 (CHURCH WALTER L) | [A] - "STANDARDIZED PLATFORM REMOVAL EQUIPMENT CAN CUT COSTS AND TIME ALTERNATIVES SUGGESTED FOR CONVENTIONAL REVERSE INSTALLATION SEQUENCE", OFFSHORE (INC. THE OILMAN), (19890801), vol. 49, no. 8, page 76/77, 79, XP000084063 [A] 1,4 |