EP0925758 - DEVICE FOR RECORDING SKIN GALVANIC REACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/26] | METHOD FOR RECORDING SKIN GALVANIC REACTIONS AND DEVICE FOR REALIZING THE SAME | ||
[2003/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zakrytoe Aktsionernoe Obschestvo "Neirokom" ul. Vavilova, 31-1 Moscow, 117312 / RU | [1999/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALCHENKOV, Leonid Arkadievich ul. Dubnenskaya, 38-1-30 Moscow, 127247 / RU | 02 /
DEMENTIENKO, Valery Vasilievich ul. Komsomolskaya, 8-41, Moskovskaya obl. Schelkovo, 141100 / RU | 03 /
KORENEVA, Lidia Georgievna ul. Komsomolskaya, 3-112, Moskovskaya obl. Reutov, 143952 / RU | 04 /
MARKOV, Andrei Genrikhovich pr-d Cherepanovykh, 46B-52 Moscow, 125183 / RU | 05 /
SHAKHNAROVICH, Vyacheslav Markovich ul. Krasnoprudnaya, 26-51 Moscow, 107140 / RU | [1999/26] | Representative(s) | Andrae, Steffen, et al Andrae l Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | Andrae, Steffen, Dr., et al Andrae Flach Haug Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97926303.5 | 22.05.1997 | [1999/26] | WO1997RU00162 | Priority number, date | RU19960110526 | 28.05.1996 Original published format: RU 96110526 | [1999/26] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9745162 | Date: | 04.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0925758 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0925758 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 04.12.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/05 | [1999/26] | CPC: |
A61B5/7207 (EP,US);
A61B5/0533 (EP,US);
A61B5/16 (EP);
A61B5/7239 (EP,US);
A61N1/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1999/26] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFZEICHNEN VON GALVANISCHEN HAUTREAKTIONEN | [2003/23] | English: | DEVICE FOR RECORDING SKIN GALVANIC REACTIONS | [2003/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENREGISTREMENT DE REACTIONS GALVANIQUES SUR LA PEAU | [2003/23] |
Former [1999/26] | VERFAHREN ZUM AUFZEICHNEN VON GALVANISCHEN HAUTREAKTIONEN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | ||
Former [1999/26] | METHOD FOR RECORDING SKIN GALVANIC REACTIONS AND DEVICE FOR REALIZING THE SAME | ||
Former [1999/26] | PROCEDE D'ENREGISTREMENT DES REACTIONS GALVANIQUES SUR LA PEAU ET DISPOSITIF DE MISE EN OEUVRE DE CE PROCEDE | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.1998 | Translation filed | 23.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.1998 | Search fee paid | 23.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: RU | 23.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/26] | 20.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.11.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 14.01.2004 | [2006/12] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0691620 (ELA MEDICAL SA [FR]) [A] 1,2,7,9,11 * page 2, line 3 - line 20 * * page 3, line 18 - line 25 * * page 4, line 23 - line 38 * * page 6, line 32 - line 33 * * page 7, line 16 - page 8, line 1 ** figure . * | International search | [A]SU1217340 (MO T I MYASNOJ MOLOCH PROMY [SU]); | [A]US4595018 (RANTALA BOERJE [FI]); | [A]SU1286160 (GO G MED INST [SU]); | [A]SU1421299 (LE NI NEJROKHIRURG I [SU]); | [A]SU1489720 (MO I INZHENEROV ZHELEZNODOROZH [SU]) | by applicant | US4331160 | SU1567427 | SU1725829 |