EP1021307 - TIRE WITH IMPROVED CARCASS PLY TURNUP CONFIGURATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.02.2001 [2001/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company 1144 East Market Street Akron, Ohio 44309-3531 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/30] | For all designated states THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY 1144 East Market Street Akron, Ohio 44309-3531 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAYMAN, William, Earl 11271 Wilhurst Avenue Hartville, OH 44632 / US | [2000/30] | Representative(s) | Leitz, Paul Goodyear Technical Center, Patent Department, Avenue Gordon Smith 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | [2000/30] | Application number, filing date | 97926619.4 | 20.05.1997 | [2000/30] | WO1997US08543 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9852778 | Date: | 26.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1021307 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60C15/00, B60C15/06, B60C11/02 | [2000/30] | CPC: |
B60C11/02 (EP);
B60C15/00 (KR);
B60C15/0027 (EP);
B60C15/06 (EP);
B60C15/0607 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [2000/30] | Title | German: | REIFEN MIT EINER VERBESSERTEN KONFIGURATION DES KARKASSENSCHICHTENUMSCHLAGES | [2000/30] | English: | TIRE WITH IMPROVED CARCASS PLY TURNUP CONFIGURATION | [2000/30] | French: | PNEU A STRUCTURE DE RETOURNEMENT DE PLI DE CARCASSE PERFECTIONNEE | [2000/30] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/30] | 18.12.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPH0411506 ; | [Y]GB2073109 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER) [Y] 1,5-8 * figure -; claims 6,7 *; | [A]JPH0456608 ; | [AD]US4609023 (LOSER ROBERT P [US]) [AD] 2-4,9,11-14 * column 2, line 58 - line 62; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US4846238 (KADOTA KUNINOBU [JP], et al) [A] 1,10; | [A]JPH04317806 ; | [A]JPH0664412 ; | [A]EP0202925 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [A] 2-4,11-13 * figure -; claim - * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920420), vol. 016, no. 161, Database accession no. (M - 1237), & JP04011506 A 19920116 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND LTD) [X] 10 * abstract * [Y] 1,5-8 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920605), vol. 016, no. 248, Database accession no. (M - 1261), & JP04056608 A 19920224 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD:THE) [A] 1,10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930322), vol. 017, no. 139, Database accession no. (M - 1385), & JP04317806 A 19921109 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD:THE) [A] 1,10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940610), vol. 018, no. 304, Database accession no. (M - 1619), & JP06064412 A 19940308 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1,10 * abstract * |