Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9851884 | Global Dossier | 19.11.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US85772797 | 16.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU7247598 | Global Dossier | 08.12.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US9807476 | 29.04.1998 | US85772797 | 16.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3140597 | Global Dossier | 05.12.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US9708755 | 16.05.1997 | US64905196 | 16.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0898630 | Global Dossier | 23.02.2000 | A4 | EP0898630 | 03.03.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9708755 | 16.05.1997 | US64905196 | 16.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2254917 | 20.11.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9708755 | 16.05.1997 | US64905196 | 16.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5893252 | 13.04.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US64905196 | 16.05.1996 | US85772797 | 16.05.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9743503 | Global Dossier | 20.11.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US64905196 | 16.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6112494 | 05.09.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US64905196 | 16.05.1996 |