EP0898630 - SYSTEM FOR AFFIXING REBAR LATTICE TO RECEIVE CONCRETE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.10.2000 [2000/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hardy Construction Technology, L.L.C. Suite 108, 2511B Nasa Road One Seabrook, TX 77586 / US | [1999/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARDY, Robert, M., Jr. 300 Kirby Road Taylor Lake Village, TX 77586 / US | 02 /
WATERS, Louis, A., Jr. 520 Post Oak Boulevard,Suite 850 Houston Texas 77027 / US | [1999/24] |
Former [1999/09] | 01 /
HARDY, Robert, M., Jr. 300 Kirby Road Taylor Lake Village, TX 77586 / US | ||
02 /
WATERS, Louis, A., Jr. 4522 Teas Street Bellaire, TX 77401 / US | Representative(s) | Allman, Peter John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/09] | Allman, Peter John, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 97926696.2 | 16.05.1997 | [1999/09] | WO1997US08755 | Priority number, date | US19960649051 | 16.05.1996 Original published format: US 649051 | [1999/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9743503 | Date: | 20.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0898630 | Date: | 03.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.11.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E04C5/16, E04C5/20 | [2000/08] | CPC: |
E04C5/168 (EP,US);
E04C5/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/09] | E04C5/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/09] | Title | German: | ABSTANDSHALTER FÜR BEWEHRUNGSMATTE FÜR BETON | [1999/09] | English: | SYSTEM FOR AFFIXING REBAR LATTICE TO RECEIVE CONCRETE | [1999/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION D'UN TREILLIS DE BARRES D'ARMATURE POUR BETON | [1999/09] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.1998 | Search fee paid | 16.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/09] | 07.04.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/42] | 24.05.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4644726 (WHEELER CHARLES F [US]) [A] 1,12,25 * abstract *; | [A]DE4224776 (DREIZLER SELMA [DE]) [A] 1,11,24 * column 5, line 62 - line 66; figure - * | International search | [X]US1613351 (KLINGER AUGUST E, et al); | [X]US3105423 (REILAND FRANK D); | [X]US3673753 (ANDERSON GEORGE C); | [X]US3788025 (HOLMES S); | [X]US4007572 (ILUKOWICZ ROBERT J); | [X]US4835933 (YUNG FERNAND P [US]); | [X]US5400562 (BAEHR RICHARD [DE]) |