EP0907323 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING EDIBLE WAFFLE PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FI | published on 25.05.2005 [2005/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Franz Haas Waffelmaschinen-Industrie Aktiengesellschaft Prager Strasse 124 1210 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/15] | For all designated states Franz Haas Waffelmaschinen- Industrie Aktiengesellschaft Pragerstrasse 124 1210 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAAS, Franz, sen Gerstlgasse 25 A-1210 Wien / AT | 02 /
HAAS, Johann Seitweg 5 A-3400 Klosterneuburg / AT | 03 /
TIEFENBACHER, Karl Geblergasse 78 A-1170 Wien / AT | [1999/15] | Representative(s) | Puchberger, Rolf, et al Puchberger Berger & Partner Reichsratsstrasse 13 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | Puchberger, Rolf, et al Puchberger Berger & Partner Patentanwälte Siebensterngasse 39 1071 Wien / AT | ||
Former [1999/15] | Berger, Erhard, Dr. Siebensterngasse 39 1070 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 97926904.0 | 13.06.1997 | [1999/15] | WO1997AT00128 | Priority number, date | AT19960001039 | 13.06.1996 Original published format: AT 103996 | [1999/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9747205 | Date: | 18.12.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/54] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0907323 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0907323 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A21D8/08, A21D2/16 | [1999/15] | CPC: |
A21D8/08 (EP,US);
A21D2/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/15] | Extension states | AL | 27.11.1998 | LT | 27.11.1998 | LV | 27.11.1998 | RO | 27.11.1998 | SI | 27.11.1998 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ESSBAREN WAFFEL-PRODUKTEN | [1999/15] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING EDIBLE WAFFLE PRODUCTS | [1999/15] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE PRODUITS GAUFRES COMESTIBLES | [1999/15] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/15] | 21.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 22.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 21.08.2002 | GR | 21.08.2002 | IE | 21.08.2002 | DK | 21.11.2002 | SE | 21.11.2002 | PT | 05.12.2002 | ES | 28.02.2003 | [2005/21] |
Former [2005/01] | GR | 21.08.2002 | |
IE | 21.08.2002 | ||
DK | 21.11.2002 | ||
SE | 21.11.2002 | ||
PT | 05.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.02.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | GR | 21.08.2002 | |
IE | 21.08.2002 | ||
DK | 21.11.2002 | ||
PT | 05.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | GR | 21.08.2002 | |
IE | 21.08.2002 | ||
DK | 21.11.2002 | ||
PT | 05.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/42] | GR | 21.08.2002 | |
IE | 21.08.2002 | ||
PT | 05.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | GR | 21.08.2002 | |
PT | 05.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | GR | 21.08.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB625683 (BEST FOODS INC) [A] 1 * page 2, line 17 - line 42 * * examples 1,3,6,10,12 * * examples 14,19 * * claim 11 *; | [A]GB670955 (BEST FOODS INC) [A] 1 * page 3; table 1 * * page 4 - page 5; tables 2,3 * * page 6, line 73 - line 80 * * examples 1,3 *; | [X]GB756549 (SCHOU HERBERT) [X] 1 * page 1, line 9 - line 18 * * page 1, line 49 - line 75 * * page 2, line 38 - line 51 * * page 4, line 17 - line 30 * * page 6, line 99 - line 103 * * claims 1,15,16 *; | [A]GB924268 (CORN PRODUCTS CO) [A] 1 * page 3, line 42 - line 56 *; | [A]US3721570 (LINTERIS L) [A] 1 * column 1, line 5 - line 7 * * column 2, line 62 - line 67 *; | [A]US3949094 (JOHNSON LAWRENCE A, et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 16 - line 18 ** column 5, line 31 - line 36 *; | [PX]WO9700015 (HAAS FRANZ WAFFELMASCH [AT], et al) [PX] 1-3 * page 4, line 35 - page 5, line 25 * * page 19; examples 92-95 * * page 22, paragraph L - page 23, paragraph 1 * * claims 1,8 * |