15.06.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] |
09.01.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.02.2004 [2004/09] |
26.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] |
30.08.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2002 [2002/42] |
19.04.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] |
18.01.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2002 [2002/10] |
02.02.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2001 [2001/12] |
22.09.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 08.11.2000 [2000/45] |
08.09.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2000 [2000/43] |
08.10.1999 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 24.11.1999 [1999/47] |
06.08.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.06.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.05.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
17.05.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.04.1999 |
First examination report |
|
26.04.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
26.04.1999 |
Request for accelerated examination |
|
19.02.1999 |
Request for accelerated examination |
|
12.02.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.03.1999 [1999/13] |
12.02.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.03.1999 [1999/13] |
04.02.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.12.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.03.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.03.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.07.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|