EP0904444 - PROCESS FOR TREATING CELLULOSE FIBRES AND STRUCTURES MADE OF THOSE FIBRES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LENZING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werkstrasse 2 4860 Lenzing / AT | [1999/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EIBL, Markus Bahnhofstrasse 38 A-4840 Vöcklabruck / AT | [1999/13] | Representative(s) | Schwarz, Albin, et al Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 30 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | Schwarz, Albin, Dr. Kopecky & Schwarz Patentanwälte, et al Wipplingerstrasse 32/22 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 97926908.1 | 19.06.1997 | [1999/13] | WO1997AT00132 | Priority number, date | AT19960001107 | 21.06.1996 Original published format: AT 110796 | [1999/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9749856 | Date: | 31.12.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/57] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0904444 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0904444 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D06M13/358, D06P1/00 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
D01F2/00 (EP,US);
D06M13/358 (EP,US);
D06P1/0004 (EP,US);
D06P1/6426 (EP,US);
D06P3/66 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON CELLULOSEFASERN UND VON GEBILDEN AUS DIESEN FASERN | [1999/13] | English: | PROCESS FOR TREATING CELLULOSE FIBRES AND STRUCTURES MADE OF THOSE FIBRES | [1999/13] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE FIBRES DE CELLULOSE ET DE STRUCTURES CONSTITUEES DE CES FIBRES | [1999/13] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/13] | 18.02.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 30.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.04.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 21.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 24.11.1999 | DK | 24.02.2000 | PT | 24.02.2000 | LU | 19.06.2000 | GR | 30.06.2000 | MC | 30.06.2000 | IE | 19.07.2000 | [2007/29] |
Former [2004/09] | SE | 24.11.1999 | |
DK | 24.02.2000 | ||
PT | 24.02.2000 | ||
GR | 30.06.2000 | ||
MC | 30.06.2000 | ||
IE | 19.07.2000 | ||
Former [2003/46] | SE | 24.11.1999 | |
DK | 24.02.2000 | ||
PT | 24.02.2000 | ||
MC | 30.06.2000 | ||
IE | 19.07.2000 | ||
Former [2002/42] | SE | 24.11.1999 | |
PT | 24.02.2000 | ||
MC | 30.06.2000 | ||
IE | 19.07.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | SE | 24.11.1999 | |
PT | 24.02.2000 | ||
IE | 19.07.2000 | ||
Former [2002/10] | PT | 24.02.2000 | |
IE | 19.07.2000 | ||
Former [2001/12] | IE | 24.11.1999 | |
PT | 24.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/43] | PT | 24.02.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1166741 (BEMBERG SPA [IT]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0118983 (WOOL DEV INT [GB]) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [Y]EP0175225 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [Y] 1,3-14 * the whole document *; | [DY]DE3740650 (BAYER AG [DE]) [DY] 1-14 * example 9; claim - *; | [DY]EP0538977 (COURTAULDS PLC [GB]) [DY] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [DY]WO9409191 (COURTAULDS FIBRES LTD [GB], et al) [DY] 1-14 * claims 1,2,4-6,9-19 *; | [DY]WO9424343 (CHEMIEFASER LENZING AG [AT]) [DY] 1-14 * claims 1-11 * |