EP0901269 - PORTABLE TELEPHONE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/10] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKASU, Jiro, Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | 02 /
HAYASHI, Hideki, Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | 03 /
TSUKADA, Tomoaki, Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | 04 /
KODAKA, Kunio, Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | 05 /
ONOOKA, Yasushi, Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | 06 /
YAMAMOTO, Kazuhiro, Mitsubishi Denki K. K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | 07 /
YAMANAKA, Shunji Ebisu Viewtower 2709, 4-4, Mita 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153 / JP | 08 /
MITANI, Yuji Shioda-Sou 5, 772, Futako, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213 / JP | [1999/10] | Representative(s) | Reitzle, Helmut Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/10] | Reitzle, Helmut, Dr. Patentanwälte Pfenning, Meinig & Partner Mozartstrasse 17 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97927379.4 | 17.06.1997 | [1999/10] | WO1997JP02086 | Priority number, date | JP19960157127 | 18.06.1996 Original published format: JP 15712796 | JP19970049436 | 04.03.1997 Original published format: JP 4943697 | [1999/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9749232 | Date: | 24.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0901269 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04M15/00, H04B7/26, H04M1/02, H04Q7/38 | [1999/10] | CPC: |
H04M15/83 (EP,US);
H04M15/00 (EP,US);
H04M15/30 (EP,US);
H04M17/00 (EP,US);
H04M2215/32 (EP,US);
H04M2215/82 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1999/10] | Title | German: | TRAGBARES FERNSPRECHSYSTEM | [1999/10] | English: | PORTABLE TELEPHONE SYSTEM | [1999/10] | French: | SYSTEME DE TELEPHONE PORTATIF | [1999/10] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.1998 | Translation filed | 30.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.1998 | Search fee paid | 30.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 30.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/10] | 04.11.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS54114020 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [Y]JPS6142140U ; | [Y]JPS62278870 (NEC CORP); | [Y]JPS6338331 (NEC CORP); | [A]JPH01288157 (NEC CORP, et al); | [Y]JPH02171077 (NEC CORP); | [Y]JPH0345031 (ANRITSU CORP); | [Y]JPH03162026 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPH03280652 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [Y]JPH04321362 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPH0514551 (KOKUSAI ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al); | [A]JPH0591022 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | [A]JPH0544567U ; | [Y]JPH06189036 (FUJITSU LTD); | [Y]JPH0766763 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | [Y]JPH0884202 (CANON KK); | [A]JP3023231U ; | [A]JP3027967U ; | [P]JPH08274705 (KYOCERA CORP) |