EP0923577 - OXAZOLONE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS ANTI-HELICOBACTER PYLORI AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | ||
Former [1999/25] | For all designated states Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1-1 Doshomachi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANAMARU, Tsuneo 18-7, Daiwa 1-chome, Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569 / JP | 02 /
NAKAO, Masafumi 720-74, Ozecho, Ikoma-shi Nara 630-02 / JP | 03 /
TAWADA, Hiroyuki 11-1, Miyanokawahara 1-chome, Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569 / JP | 04 /
KAMIYAMA, Keiji 5-41-306, Matsugamotocho, Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567 / JP | [1999/25] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1999/25] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 97927428.9 | 24.06.1997 | [1999/25] | WO1997JP02157 | Priority number, date | JP19960164854 | 25.06.1996 Original published format: JP 16485496 | JP19970025162 | 07.02.1997 Original published format: JP 2516297 | [1999/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9749703 | Date: | 31.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/57] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0923577 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07D413/06, C07D263/48, C07D413/14, C12P17/16, A61K31/42 | [1999/25] | CPC: |
C07D413/06 (EP);
C07D263/48 (EP);
C07D413/14 (EP);
C07D471/04 (EP);
C12P17/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/25] | Title | German: | OXAZOLONE DERIVATE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS ANTI HELICOBACTER PYLORI MITTEL | [1999/25] | English: | OXAZOLONE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS ANTI-HELICOBACTER PYLORI AGENT | [1999/25] | French: | DERIVES DE L'OXAZOLONE ET LEUR UTILISATION EN TANT QU'AGENT ANTI-HELICOBACTER PYLORI | [1999/25] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/25] | 05.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4584385 (DIRLAM JOHN P [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US3320282 (VON WITTENAU MANFRED SCHACH, et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US3173923 (RAO KOPPAKA V, et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9601821 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]GB862685 (PFIZER & CO C) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A] - WERNER ROLF G ET AL., "Directed biosynthesis of new indolmycins.", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19810831), vol. 95, no. 9, Database accession no. 78399t, page 578, XP002049064 [A] 21 * abstract * | [ ] - J.ANTIBIOT., (1981), vol. 34, no. 5, pages 551 - 554 |