EP0910463 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A DRY POWDER PARTICLE, A POWDER PRODUCED WITH SAID METHOD, AND AN ELECTRODE AND AN APPARATUS FOR USE IN SAID METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technische Universiteit Delft Julianalaan 134 2628 BL Delft / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | For all designated states TECHNISCHE UNIVERSITEIT DELFT Julianalaan 134 2628 BL Delft / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORRA, Jean-Pascal, Dominique, Maurice Franklinstraat 137 NL-2562 CC Den Haag / NL | [1999/17] | Representative(s) | van Breda, Jacobus Octrooibureau Los & Stigter B.V. P.O. Box 20052 1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | Van Breda, Jacobus Octrooibureau Los & Stigter B.V., Weteringschans 96 1017 XS Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 97927495.8 | 27.06.1997 | [1999/17] | WO1997NL00366 | Priority number, date | NL19961003442 | 27.06.1996 Original published format: NL 1003442 | [1999/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9749484 | Date: | 31.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/57] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0910463 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0910463 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B01J2/02, B01J2/00, B05B5/08, B01J14/00, B01J19/08 | [1999/17] | CPC: |
B05B5/003 (EP,US);
B01J14/00 (EP,US);
B01J19/088 (EP,US);
B01J19/26 (EP,US);
B01J2/02 (EP,US);
B01J37/0054 (EP,US);
B05B5/081 (EP,US);
C01B13/34 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00121 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TROCKENEN PULVERTEILCHEN, PULVER HERGESTELLT DURCH DIESES VERFAHREN UND EINE ELEKTRODE UND EINE VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANWENDUNG IN DIESEM VERFAHREN | [1999/17] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A DRY POWDER PARTICLE, A POWDER PRODUCED WITH SAID METHOD, AND AN ELECTRODE AND AN APPARATUS FOR USE IN SAID METHOD | [1999/17] | French: | PROCEDE POUR FABRIQUER DES PARTICULES DE POUDRE SECHE, POUDRE PRODUITE SELON LEDIT PROCEDE, ET ELECTRODE ET DISPOSITIF DESTINES AUDIT PROCEDE | [1999/17] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/17] | 07.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 18.12.2002 | CH | 18.12.2002 | IT | 18.12.2002 | LI | 18.12.2002 | NL | 18.12.2002 | SE | 18.03.2003 | [2008/07] |
Former [2003/51] | BE | 18.12.2002 | |
CH | 18.12.2002 | ||
LI | 18.12.2002 | ||
NL | 18.12.2002 | ||
SE | 18.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/39] | CH | 18.12.2002 | |
LI | 18.12.2002 | ||
NL | 18.12.2002 | ||
SE | 18.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 18.12.2002 | |
SE | 18.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/27] | SE | 18.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2685537 (PAUL DUNMIRE RUSSELL) [X] 1,3,5,18,19 * column W *; | [XY]FR1360193 (SAMES MACH ELECTROSTAT) [X] 1-3,6,12,15,23-25 * page 3, column L, paragraph 5 - column R, paragraph 3; figure 4 * [Y] 1,7; | [YA]DE3126854 (NUKEM GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,7 * page 4 * * page 8, line 1 - page 10, paragraph 1; example - * [A] 9,17,18,21,22; | [X]US4383767 (JIDO MORIO [JP]) [X] 1,3,6,23* figure 1 * |