21.11.2008 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] |
03.10.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] |
11.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] |
28.07.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2006 [2006/35] |
17.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
17.02.2006 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
10.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] |
28.10.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2005 [2005/50] |
25.02.2005 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.04.2005 [2005/15] |
22.02.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
22.02.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
19.11.2004 |
Change - applicant |
published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] |
17.09.2004 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.06.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.05.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.03.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.10.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.10.2003 |
First examination report |
|
07.06.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.06.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
26.04.2002 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] |
26.04.2002 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] |
16.05.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.05.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.10.1999 |
Change - inventor |
published on 08.12.1999 [1999/49] |
01.10.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.11.1999 [1999/46] |
01.10.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.11.1999 [1999/46] |
07.06.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.05.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.03.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.12.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.01.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.01.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.07.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|