Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9929213 | Global Dossier | 17.06.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US6909797 | 11.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9918827 | Global Dossier | 22.04.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US6662797 | 26.11.1997 | US6429798 | 22.04.1998 | US6149497 | 09.10.1997 | US6149297 | 09.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9829231 | Global Dossier | 09.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77573696 | 31.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9719619 | Global Dossier | 05.06.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US56540995 | 30.11.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6952852 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2005 | B2 | US2004133987 | 15.07.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US6662797 | 26.11.1997 | US3311698 | 02.03.1998 | US74514303 | 23.12.2003 | US18678202 | 01.07.2002 | US6429798 | 22.04.1998 | US56540995 | 30.11.1995 | US6149497 | 09.10.1997 | US6149297 | 09.10.1997 | US48471000 | 18.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001525206 | Global Dossier | 11.12.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US6909797 | 11.12.1997 | US9826295 | 11.12.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001519186 | Global Dossier | 23.10.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US9821332 | 09.10.1998 | US6662797 | 26.11.1997 | US6429798 | 22.04.1998 | US6149497 | 09.10.1997 | US6149297 | 09.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4370426B | Global Dossier | 25.11.2009 | B2 | JP2001507641 | 12.06.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US9709711 | 03.06.1997 | US77573696 | 31.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000511086 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US9708711 | 16.05.1997 | US65341696 | 24.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3985905B | Global Dossier | 03.10.2007 | B2 | JP2000501305 | 08.02.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US56540995 | 30.11.1995 | US9618884 | 25.11.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1464258 | Global Dossier | 22.12.2004 | A3 | EP1464258 | 06.10.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US6662797 | 26.11.1997 | EP98952197 | 09.10.1998 | US6429798 | 22.04.1998 | US6149497 | 09.10.1997 | US6149297 | 09.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1277818 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2003 | A3 | EP1277818 | 22.01.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP97927979 | 03.06.1997 | US77573696 | 31.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1037545 | Global Dossier | 16.02.2005 | B1 | EP1037545 | 17.01.2001 | A4 | EP1037545 | 27.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US6909797 | 11.12.1997 | US9826295 | 11.12.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1021108 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2004 | B1 | EP1021108 | 26.07.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9821332 | 09.10.1998 | US6662797 | 26.11.1997 | US6429798 | 22.04.1998 | US6149497 | 09.10.1997 | US6149297 | 09.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1011955 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2003 | B1 | EP1011955 | 28.06.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9709711 | 03.06.1997 | US77573696 | 31.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0869728 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2000 | A4 | EP0869728 | 14.10.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US56540995 | 30.11.1995 | US9618884 | 25.11.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU9795198 | Global Dossier | 03.05.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US9821332 | 09.10.1998 | US6662797 | 26.11.1997 | US6429798 | 22.04.1998 | US6149497 | 09.10.1997 | US6149297 | 09.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU716683B | Global Dossier | 02.03.2000 | B2 | AU3230697 | 31.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US9709711 | 03.06.1997 | US77573696 | 31.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3210497 | Global Dossier | 09.12.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US9708711 | 16.05.1997 | US65341696 | 24.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU1816199 | Global Dossier | 28.06.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US6909797 | 11.12.1997 | US9826295 | 11.12.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU1082997 | Global Dossier | 19.06.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US56540995 | 30.11.1995 | US9618884 | 25.11.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0955848 | Global Dossier | 13.04.2005 | B1 | EP0955848 | 12.06.2002 | A4 | EP0955848 | 17.11.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9708711 | 16.05.1997 | US65341696 | 24.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE292922T | 15.04.2005 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US9708711 | 16.05.1997 | US65341696 | 24.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9611795 | 28.12.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US56540995 | 30.11.1995 | UA9601884 | 25.11.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9709114 | 03.08.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US9708711 | 16.05.1997 | US65341696 | 24.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9714119 | 29.02.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US9708711 | 16.05.1997 | US77573696 | 31.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9812858 | 08.08.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US9821332 | 09.10.1998 | US6662797 | 26.11.1997 | US6429798 | 22.04.1998 | US6149497 | 09.10.1997 | US6149297 | 09.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9813488 | 24.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US6909797 | 11.12.1997 | US9826295 | 11.12.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2239121 | 31.01.2006 | C | CA2239121 | 05.06.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US56540995 | 30.11.1995 | US9618884 | 25.11.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2274681 | 06.12.2005 | C | CA2274681 | 09.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9709711 | 03.06.1997 | US77573696 | 31.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2305522 | 22.04.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9821332 | 09.10.1998 | US6662797 | 26.11.1997 | US6429798 | 22.04.1998 | US6149497 | 09.10.1997 | US6149297 | 09.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2313793 | 17.06.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US6909797 | 11.12.1997 | US9826295 | 11.12.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1072100C | 03.10.2001 | C | CN1241962 | 19.01.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US77573696 | 31.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69720548T | 12.02.2004 | T2 | DE69720548D1 | 08.05.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9709711 | 03.06.1997 | US77573696 | 31.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69733034T | 15.09.2005 | T2 | DE69733034D1 | 19.05.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9708711 | 16.05.1997 | US65341696 | 24.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69823534T | 14.10.2004 | T2 | DE69823534D1 | 03.06.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9821332 | 09.10.1998 | US6662797 | 26.11.1997 | US6429798 | 22.04.1998 | US6149497 | 09.10.1997 | US6149297 | 09.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69829073T | 30.06.2005 | T2 | DE69829073D1 | 24.03.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US6909797 | 11.12.1997 | US9826295 | 11.12.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1011955T | 28.07.2003 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US9709711 | 03.06.1997 | US77573696 | 31.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2191182T | 01.09.2003 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US77573696 | 31.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100475494B | 10.03.2005 | B1 | KR20000062342 | 25.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US9709711 | 03.06.1997 | US77573696 | 31.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ336082 | 24.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US9709711 | 03.06.1997 | US77573696 | 31.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2002124320 | 12.09.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9482802 | 11.03.2002 | US3311698 | 02.03.1998 | US56540995 | 30.11.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6687935 | 10.02.2004 | B2 | US2002178503 | 05.12.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US6662797 | 26.11.1997 | US3311698 | 02.03.1998 | US18678202 | 01.07.2002 | US6429798 | 22.04.1998 | US56540995 | 30.11.1995 | US6149497 | 09.10.1997 | US6149297 | 09.10.1997 | US48471000 | 18.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5802646 | 08.09.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US65341696 | 24.05.1996 | US56540995 | 30.11.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5815865 | 06.10.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US56540995 | 30.11.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5897930 | 27.04.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US77573696 | 31.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6115861 | 12.09.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US6662797 | 26.11.1997 | US6429798 | 22.04.1998 | US6149497 | 09.10.1997 | US6149297 | 09.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6286167 | 11.09.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US58502900 | 01.06.2000 | US6909797 | 11.12.1997 | US6429798 | 22.04.1998 | US9826295 | 11.12.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6378152 | 30.04.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US3311698 | 02.03.1998 | US56540995 | 30.11.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6460209 | 08.10.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US6662797 | 26.11.1997 | US3311698 | 02.03.1998 | US6429798 | 22.04.1998 | US56540995 | 30.11.1995 | US6149497 | 09.10.1997 | US6149297 | 09.10.1997 | US48471000 | 18.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | USRE38135E | 10.06.2003 | E | Priority number | Date | US65679100 | 07.09.2000 | US65341696 | 24.05.1996 | US56540995 | 30.11.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9743927 | Global Dossier | 27.11.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US65341696 | 24.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2255616 | 27.11.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US65341696 | 24.05.1996 |