EP0955848 - MATTRESS STRUCTURE HAVING A FOAM MATTRESS CORE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hill-Rom Services, Inc. 1069 State Route 46 East Batesville, IN 47006 / US | [2005/01] |
Former [1999/46] | For all designated states HILL-ROM, INC. 1069 State Route 46 East Batesville, Indiana 47006-9167 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOLPMANN, James, R. 1011 Travers Drive Charleston, SC 29412 / US | 02 /
FERDON, Gary, M. 387 Culver Avenue Charleston, SC 29407 / US | 03 /
DALTON, Roger, D. 105 Fernleaf Street Monsks Corner, SC 29461 / US | [1999/49] |
Former [1999/46] | 01 /
STOLPMANN, James, R. 15-B Town Park Lane Charleston, SC 29412 / US | ||
02 /
FERDON, Gary, M. 387 Culver Avenue Charleston, SC 29407 / US | |||
03 /
DALTON, Roger, D. 105 Fernleaf Street Monsks Corner, SC 29461 / US | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/46] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 97927710.0 | 16.05.1997 | [1999/46] | WO1997US08711 | Priority number, date | US19960653416 | 24.05.1996 Original published format: US 653416 | [1999/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9743927 | Date: | 27.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0955848 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0955848 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.11.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A47C27/15, A47C27/14 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
A47C31/08 (EP,US);
A47C27/146 (EP,US);
A47C27/148 (EP,US);
A47C27/20 (EP,US);
A61G7/05776 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/46] | A47C27/15 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1999/46] | Title | German: | MATRAZZE MIT EINEM SCHAUMSTOFFKERN | [1999/46] | English: | MATTRESS STRUCTURE HAVING A FOAM MATTRESS CORE | [1999/46] | French: | STRUCTURE DE MATELAS MUNIE D'UNE AME EN MOUSSE | [1999/46] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.1998 | Search fee paid | 20.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 28.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.04.2005 | FR | 13.04.2005 | IT | 13.04.2005 | NL | 13.04.2005 | GB | 13.07.2005 | SE | 13.07.2005 | DE | 01.12.2005 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/45] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
IT | 13.04.2005 | ||
NL | 13.04.2005 | ||
FR | 31.05.2005 | ||
GB | 13.07.2005 | ||
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
DE | 01.12.2005 | ||
Former [2008/07] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
IT | 13.04.2005 | ||
NL | 13.04.2005 | ||
GB | 13.07.2005 | ||
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
DE | 01.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
NL | 13.04.2005 | ||
GB | 13.07.2005 | ||
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
DE | 01.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
NL | 13.04.2005 | ||
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 13.07.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4862538 (SPANN DONALD C [US], et al) [A] 1,15,19 * figure 6 *; | [A]US5081728 (SKINNER CHARLES W [CA]) [A] 1,6,15,19,28* figure 2 *; | [X]US5101527 (WADSWORTH III RALPH A [US], et al) [X] 15,19 * figures 1,11 * | International search | [A]US3731327 (FREY L); | [A]US4580301 (LUDMAN WALTER R [GB], et al); | [X]US4862538 (SPANN DONALD C [US], et al); | [A]US5081728 (SKINNER CHARLES W [CA]); | [X]US5101527 (WADSWORTH III RALPH A [US], et al); | [A]US5179742 (OBERLE JOSEPH F [US]) | by applicant | US4449261 | US4879776 | US4991244 | US5038433 | US5077849 | US5105488 | US5111542 | US5172439 |