EP0906097 - ANTI-VIRAL COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY 307 East McCarty Street Indianapolis IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/14] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY 307, East McCarty Street Indianapolis Indiana 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNGHEIM, Louis, N. 8218 Meadowbrook Drive Indianapolis, IN 46240 / US | 02 /
SHEPHERD, Timothy, A. 8463 Sliperry Elm Court Indianapolis, IN 46227 / US | 03 /
SPITZER, Wayne, A. 5501 Moller Road Indianapolis, IN 46254 / US | 04 /
TEBBE, Mark, J. 6202 North Sherman Drive Indianapolis, IN 46220 / US | [1999/14] | Representative(s) | Denholm, Anna Marie Eli Lilly and Company Limited Lilly Research Center Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/14] | Denholm, Anna Marie Eli Lilly and Company Limited, Lilly Research Center, Erl Wood Manor Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 97927738.1 | 05.06.1997 | [1999/14] | WO1997US08848 | Priority number, date | US19960019170P | 05.06.1996 Original published format: US 19170 P | [1999/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9746237 | Date: | 11.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0906097 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.12.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/415, C07D235/30, C07D235/06 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
A61K31/415 (KR);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
C07D235/06 (EP);
C07D235/30 (EP,KR)
|
Former IPC [1999/14] | A61K31/415, C07D235/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/14] | Title | German: | ANTIVIRALE VERBINDUNGEN | [1999/14] | English: | ANTI-VIRAL COMPOUNDS | [1999/14] | French: | COMPOSES ANTIVIRAUX | [1999/14] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.1998 | Search fee paid | 03.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/14] | 14.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/27] | 31.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0091794 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document, particularly page 18, lines 15, 16, and page 19, lines 1,2 and 6,7 *; | [X]EP0091795 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document, particularly page 20, last compound, page 21, 9th, 10th and 13th compounds, examples 26-29, 39, 47, 48, 52 and 56 *; | [DX]US4492708 (SPITZER WAYNE A [US]) [DX] 1-7 * the whole document, particularly example 74 * | International search | [A]US4420479 (MORWICK TINA M [US], et al) |