EP0961584 - POWERED SURGICAL INSTRUMENTS AND CONTROL UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.08.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LINVATEC CORPORATION 11311 Concept Boulevard Largo, Florida 33773 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/51] | For all designated states LINVATEC CORPORATION 11311 Concept Boulevard Largo, Florida 33773 / US | ||
Former [1999/49] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PITZEN, James, F. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
DURST, Tim, J. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
BARTINGALE, Steven, R. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
CHOWDHERY, Noreen, A. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
HAGEN, Kathy, L. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [1999/49] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/49] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97927779.5 | 28.05.1997 | [1999/49] | WO1997US08997 | Priority number, date | US19960723800 | 30.09.1996 Original published format: US 723800 | [1999/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9814129 | Date: | 09.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0961584 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/58 | [1999/49] | CPC: |
A61B17/1626 (EP);
A61B17/88 (EP);
A61B17/142 (EP);
A61B2017/00017 (EP);
A61B2017/00464 (EP);
A61B2017/00482 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1999/49] | Title | German: | MOTORISIERTE, CHIRURGISCHE GERÄTE UND STEUEREINHEIT | [1999/49] | English: | POWERED SURGICAL INSTRUMENTS AND CONTROL UNIT | [1999/49] | French: | INSTRUMENTS CHIRURGICAUX A FONCTIONNEMENT ELECTRIQUE ET UNITE DE COMMANDE | [1999/49] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/49] | 11.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 22.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/40] | 28.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4768496 (KREIZMAN ALEXANDER ET AL) [X] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]US5217478 (REXROTH FRED) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9414129 (HEMOSTATIX CORP ;SHAW ROBERT F (US)) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9626696 (PHOTOGENESIS INC) [A] 1,19,20 * the whole document * |