EP1008148 - STABLE, CONCENTRATED SOLUTIONS OF HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT POLYANILINE AND ARTICLES THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California Business and Patent Law Mail Stop D412 Los Alamos, NM 87545 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/05] | For all designated states The Regents of The University of California Business and Patent Law, Mail Stop D412 Los Alamos, NM 87545 / US | ||
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states The Regents of The University of California Business and Patent Law, Mail Stop D412 Los Alamos, NM 87545 / US | ||
For all designated states Mattes, Benjamin R. 1205 Maclovia Street Santa Fee, NM 87501 / US | |||
For all designated states Wang, Hsing-Lin 39 Timber Ridge Road Los Alamos, NM 87544 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATTES, Benjamin, R. 1205 Maclovia Street Santa Fe, NM 87501 / US | 02 /
WANG, Hsing-Lin 39 Timber Ridge Road Los Alamos, NM 87544 / US | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Thomson, Paul Anthony, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | Thomson, Paul Anthony, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 97927824.9 | 29.05.1997 | [2000/24] | WO1997US09119 | Priority number, date | US19960658928 | 31.05.1996 Original published format: US 658928 | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9745842 | Date: | 04.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1008148 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1008148 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.12.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01B1/00, C08G73/00, H01B1/12, C08G73/02 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
C08G73/0266 (EP,US);
D01F6/76 (EP,US);
H01B1/128 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/24] | H01B1/00, C08G73/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FI, FR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/24] | Title | German: | STABILE KONZENTRIERTE LÖSUNGEN VON POLYANILINE MIT HOCHMOLEKULARGEWICHT UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTE ARTIKEL | [2000/24] | English: | STABLE, CONCENTRATED SOLUTIONS OF HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT POLYANILINE AND ARTICLES THEREFROM | [2000/24] | French: | SOLUTIONS STABLES ET CONCENTREES DE POLYANILINE DE POIDS MOLECULAIRE ELEVE ET ARTICLES PRODUITS A PARTIR DE CES SOLUTIONS | [2000/24] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.1998 | Search fee paid | 26.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.11.1998 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 27.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 21.05.2003 | FI | 21.05.2003 | FR | 21.05.2003 | IT | 21.05.2003 | LI | 21.05.2003 | NL | 21.05.2003 | IE | 29.05.2003 | PT | 21.08.2003 | SE | 21.08.2003 | DE | 22.08.2003 | ES | 01.09.2003 | [2008/07] |
Former [2004/34] | CH | 21.05.2003 | |
FI | 21.05.2003 | ||
FR | 21.05.2003 | ||
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
NL | 21.05.2003 | ||
IE | 29.05.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
DE | 22.08.2003 | ||
ES | 01.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | CH | 21.05.2003 | |
FI | 21.05.2003 | ||
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
NL | 21.05.2003 | ||
IE | 29.05.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
DE | 22.08.2003 | ||
ES | 01.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | CH | 21.05.2003 | |
FI | 21.05.2003 | ||
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
NL | 21.05.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
DE | 22.08.2003 | ||
ES | 01.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | CH | 21.05.2003 | |
FI | 21.05.2003 | ||
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
NL | 21.05.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
ES | 01.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | CH | 21.05.2003 | |
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
NL | 21.05.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
ES | 01.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 21.05.2003 | |
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
NL | 21.05.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 21.05.2003 | |
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 21.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9211644 (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [X] 1-11 * page 30, line 19 - page 33, line 33; claims 1-7 * * claims 1-7 * * page 34, line 11 - page 37, line 6 * [A] 12-16; | [XA]EP0446943 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1-11 * page 2, lines 25-49; claims 1-8 * * claims 1-8 * [A] 12-16 | International search | [A]US5278213 (HAN CHIEN-CHUNG [US], et al); | [A]US5135682 (COHEN JEFFREY D [US], et al); | [A]US5519111 (MACDIARMID ALAN G [US], et al); | [A]US5258472 (MACDIARMID ALAN G [US], et al); | [A]US5484884 (MACDIARMID ALAN G [US], et al); | [AP]US5583169 (WROBLESKI DEBRA A [US], et al) |