blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0976123

EP0976123 - COLOUR DISPLAY AND USES OF SUCH A DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.10.2001
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.11.2001 [2001/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MSM POLY-PRINT GMBH
Auf der Hüls 191
52068 Aachen / DE
For all designated states
Müller, Thomas
Dedinghauser Strasse 33
59059 Geseke 5 / DE
[2000/05]
Inventor(s)01 / MÜLLER, Thomas
Dedinghauser Strasse 33
D-59059 Geseke 5 / DE
[2000/05]
Application number, filing date97928108.630.05.1997
[2000/05]
WO1997DE01080
Priority number, dateDE199612191131.05.1996         Original published format: DE 19621911
DE199612772910.07.1996         Original published format: DE 19627729
[2000/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9745826
Date:04.12.1997
Language:DE
[1997/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0976123
Date:02.02.2000
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.12.1997
ClassificationIPC:G09G3/34
[2000/05]
CPC:
G09G3/3413 (EP); G09G3/3611 (EP); H04N7/163 (EP);
H04N9/3108 (EP); H04N9/3164 (EP); G09G2310/0235 (EP);
G09G3/001 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/05]
TitleGerman:FARBDISPLAY UND ANWENDUNGEN[2000/05]
English:COLOUR DISPLAY AND USES OF SUCH A DISPLAY[2000/05]
French:AFFICHAGE EN COULEUR ET APPLICATIONS[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase18.05.1998National basic fee paid 
18.05.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
02.06.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.06.1998Examination requested  [2000/05]
01.12.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/48]
23.05.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2001/48]
Public notification(s)FESTSTELLUNG EINES RECHTSVERLUSTS (REGEL 69(1) EPü) EPA FORM 2524
MSM POLY-PRINT GMBH
Auf der Hüls 191
52068 Aachen / DE
[2001/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
09.04.1998AT   M01   Fee paid on   18.05.1998
09.04.1998BE   M01   Not yet paid
09.04.1998CH   M01   Not yet paid
09.04.1998DE   M01   Not yet paid
09.04.1998DK   M01   Not yet paid
09.04.1998ES   M01   Not yet paid
09.04.1998FI   M01   Not yet paid
09.04.1998FR   M01   Fee paid on   18.05.1998
09.04.1998GB   M01   Fee paid on   18.05.1998
09.04.1998GR   M01   Not yet paid
09.04.1998IE   M01   Not yet paid
09.04.1998IT   M01   Fee paid on   18.05.1998
09.04.1998LU   M01   Not yet paid
09.04.1998MC   M01   Not yet paid
09.04.1998NL   M01   Fee paid on   18.05.1998
09.04.1998PT   M01   Not yet paid
09.04.1998SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.199903   M06   Fee paid on   30.11.1999
31.05.200004   M06   Not yet paid
31.05.200105   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[YA]US5359345  (HUNTER C ERIC) [Y] 1-3 * column 3, line 59 - column 5, line 20 * * column 6, line 3 - column 7, line 18; figures 1,3,4 * [A] 5;
 [YA]WO9005429  (RAYCHEM LTD) [Y] 1-3 * page 2, paragraph L * * page 6, paragraph L - page 7, paragraph 3 * * page 10, paragraph L - page 11, paragraph 1 * * page 12, paragraph 2 * * page 14, line 6 - line 7; figures 1,3 * [A] 7;
 [A]US5128782  (WOOD LAWSON A) [A] 4 * column 3, line 36 - line 51 * * column 4, line 25 - line 51 * * column 6, line 41 - line 62; figures 1,5 *;
 [A]EP0713333  (SISVEL SPA) [A] 6 * abstract * * column 4, line 22 - line 40; claims 1,8,9 *;
 [A]WO9520811  (SDL INC) [A] 7,8 * page 10, line 29 - line 33 * * page 11, line 17 - line 35 * * page 19, line 12 - line 32; figure 5 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.