EP0910627 - A RECOMBINANT ENZYME WITH DEXTRANASE ACTIVITIY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novozymes A/S Krogsho̸jvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | For all designated states Novozymes A/S Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | ||
Former [1999/17] | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHRISTENSEN, Tove Novo Nordisk a/s, Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | 02 /
FUGLSANG, Claus, Crone Novo Nordisk a/s, Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | 03 /
HALKIER, Torben Novo Nordisk a/s, Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | 04 /
JOHANSEN, Charlotte Novo Nordisk a/s, Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [1999/17] | Application number, filing date | 97928132.6 | 30.06.1997 | [1999/17] | WO1997DK00284 | Priority number, date | DK19960000714 | 28.06.1996 Original published format: DK 71496 | DK19960000919 | 30.08.1996 Original published format: DK 91996 | [1999/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9800529 | Date: | 08.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0910627 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 08.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/46, C12N15/56 | [1999/17] | CPC: |
C12N9/2454 (EP,US);
A61K8/66 (EP,US);
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
A61K2800/86 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1999/17] | Title | German: | REKOMBINANTES ENZYM MIT DEXTRANASE AKTIVITÄT | [1999/17] | English: | A RECOMBINANT ENZYME WITH DEXTRANASE ACTIVITIY | [1999/17] | French: | ENZYME RECOMBINEE A ACTIVITE DE DEXTRANASE | [1999/17] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/17] | 24.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/52] | 26.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0663443 (CIGB [CU]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 104, No. 3, 20 January 1986, (Columbus, Ohio, USA), LEE J.M. et al., "Purification and Characterization of Paecilomyces Lilacinus Dextranase", page 240, Abstract No. 16885u; & ENZYME MICROB. TECHNOL., 1985, 7(11), 573-577. | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 110, No. 25, 19 June 1989, (Columbus, Ohio, USA), SUN, JINWU et al., "A Strain of Paecilomyces Lilacinus Producing High Quality Dextranase", page 5, Abstract No. 227559c; & ANN. N.Y. ACAD. SCI., 1988, 542, 192-194. | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 119, No. 17, 25 October 1993, (Columbus, Ohio, USA), CHENG, XIULAN et al., "Conditions for Dextranase Formation by Paecilomyces Lilacinus", page 654, Abstract No. 179275u; & WEISHENGWU XUEBAO, 1992, 32(5), 334-339. | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 116, No. 7, 17 February 1992, (Columbus, Ohio, USA), GALVEZ-MARISCAL, AMANDA et al., "Production and Characterization of a Dextranase from an Isolated Paecilomyces Lilacinus Strain", page 367, Abstract No. 54253s; & APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., 1991, 36(3), 327-331. | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 108, No. 301, 20 June 1988, (Columbus, Ohio, USA), SUN, JINWU et al., "Screening of Dextranase Producing Strains and Comparison of their Enzymic Properties", page 301, Abstract No. 218770w; & WEISHENGWU XUEBAO, 1988, 28(1), 45-55. |