EP0912555 - PIPERIDINE ACETIC ACID DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF THROMBOTIC DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2001 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.07.2001 [2001/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 ONN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLEN, David, George Glaxo Wellcome plc Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | 02 /
ELDRED, Colin, David Glaxo Wellcome plc Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | 03 /
JUDKINS, Brian, David Glaxo Wellcome plc Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | 04 /
MITCHELL, William, Leonard Glaxo Wellcome plc Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | [1999/18] | Representative(s) | Filler, Wendy Anne, et al GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | Filler, Wendy Anne, Dr., et al Glaxo Wellcome plc Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | Application number, filing date | 97928243.1 | 19.06.1997 | [1999/18] | WO1997EP03196 | Priority number, date | GB19960013017 | 21.06.1996 Original published format: GB 9613017 | GB19960013018 | 21.06.1996 Original published format: GB 9613018 | GB19960013095 | 21.06.1996 Original published format: GB 9613095 | [1999/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9749699 | Date: | 31.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/57] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0912555 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, A61K31/415, A61K31/445 | [1999/18] | CPC: |
C07D401/14 (EP,KR);
A61K31/415 (KR);
C07D413/14 (EP);
C07D453/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/18] | Extension states | AL | 18.12.1998 | LT | 18.12.1998 | LV | 18.12.1998 | RO | 18.12.1998 | SI | 18.12.1998 | Title | German: | PIPERIDINESSIGSÄUREDERIVATE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG IN DER BEHANDLUNG VON THROMBOTISCHEN STÖRUNGEN | [1999/18] | English: | PIPERIDINE ACETIC ACID DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF THROMBOTIC DISORDERS | [1999/18] | French: | DERIVES PIPERIDINE DE L'ACIDE ACETIQUE ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT DES TROUBLES THROMBOTIQUES | [1999/18] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/18] | 03.01.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/29] | 26.01.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0525629 (THOMAE GMBH DR K [DE]) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [A]EP0542363 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9322303 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * |