EP0907760 - THERMAL SPRAYING METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metalspray International LC 11615 Busy Street Richmond, VA 23236 / US | [1999/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEITZ, Michael, Walter 17 Kompas Crescent Quellerina Roodepoort 1724 / ZA | [1999/15] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Peter Arthur GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/15] | Jackson, Peter Arthur GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 97928370.2 | 27.06.1997 | [1999/15] | WO1997GB01723 | Priority number, date | ZA19960005518 | 28.06.1996 Original published format: ZA 9605518 | ZA19960005519 | 28.06.1996 Original published format: ZA 9605519 | [1999/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9800574 | Date: | 08.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0907760 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0907760 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C23C4/12 | [1999/15] | CPC: |
C23C4/131 (EP,US);
B05B7/224 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM THERMISCHEN SPRITZEN | [1999/15] | English: | THERMAL SPRAYING METHOD AND APPARATUS | [1999/15] | French: | METHODE ET APPAREIL DE VAPORISATION THERMIQUE | [1999/15] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/15] | 26.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.05.2000 | BE | 03.05.2000 | ES | 03.05.2000 | FI | 03.05.2000 | GR | 03.05.2000 | IT | 03.05.2000 | NL | 03.05.2000 | IE | 27.06.2000 | LU | 27.06.2000 | MC | 03.07.2000 | DK | 03.08.2000 | PT | 03.08.2000 | SE | 03.08.2000 | [2008/07] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 03.05.2000 | |
BE | 03.05.2000 | ||
ES | 03.05.2000 | ||
FI | 03.05.2000 | ||
GR | 03.05.2000 | ||
NL | 03.05.2000 | ||
IE | 27.06.2000 | ||
LU | 27.06.2000 | ||
MC | 03.07.2000 | ||
DK | 03.08.2000 | ||
PT | 03.08.2000 | ||
SE | 03.08.2000 | ||
Former [2004/07] | AT | 03.05.2000 | |
BE | 03.05.2000 | ||
ES | 03.05.2000 | ||
FI | 03.05.2000 | ||
GR | 03.05.2000 | ||
NL | 03.05.2000 | ||
IE | 27.06.2000 | ||
MC | 03.07.2000 | ||
DK | 03.08.2000 | ||
PT | 03.08.2000 | ||
SE | 03.08.2000 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 03.05.2000 | |
BE | 03.05.2000 | ||
ES | 03.05.2000 | ||
FI | 03.05.2000 | ||
NL | 03.05.2000 | ||
IE | 27.06.2000 | ||
MC | 03.07.2000 | ||
DK | 03.08.2000 | ||
PT | 03.08.2000 | ||
SE | 03.08.2000 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 03.05.2000 | |
BE | 03.05.2000 | ||
ES | 03.05.2000 | ||
FI | 03.05.2000 | ||
NL | 03.05.2000 | ||
IE | 27.06.2000 | ||
MC | 03.07.2000 | ||
PT | 03.08.2000 | ||
SE | 03.08.2000 | ||
Former [2002/42] | AT | 03.05.2000 | |
BE | 03.05.2000 | ||
ES | 03.05.2000 | ||
FI | 03.05.2000 | ||
IE | 27.06.2000 | ||
MC | 03.07.2000 | ||
PT | 03.08.2000 | ||
SE | 03.08.2000 | ||
Former [2002/27] | AT | 03.05.2000 | |
BE | 03.05.2000 | ||
ES | 03.05.2000 | ||
FI | 03.05.2000 | ||
IE | 27.06.2000 | ||
PT | 03.08.2000 | ||
SE | 03.08.2000 | ||
Former [2001/50] | AT | 03.05.2000 | |
BE | 03.05.2000 | ||
FI | 03.05.2000 | ||
IE | 27.06.2000 | ||
PT | 03.08.2000 | ||
SE | 03.08.2000 | ||
Former [2001/29] | AT | 03.05.2000 | |
BE | 03.05.2000 | ||
FI | 03.05.2000 | ||
PT | 03.08.2000 | ||
SE | 03.08.2000 | ||
Former [2001/27] | AT | 03.05.2000 | |
BE | 03.05.2000 | ||
PT | 03.08.2000 | ||
SE | 03.08.2000 | ||
Former [2001/16] | AT | 03.05.2000 | |
BE | 03.05.2000 | ||
PT | 03.08.2000 | ||
Former [2001/11] | AT | 03.05.2000 | |
BE | 03.05.2000 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS51141736 ; | [X]JPS5827971 ; | [A]CH213068 (SCHOOP M U DR [CH]); | [A]FR2107324 (KOVOFINIS NP LEDEC); | [X]DE2746714 (OTT WALTER H R); | [X]EP0445538 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]); | [X]EP0522438 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]); | [X]DE4339345 (DIFK DEUTSCHES INST FUER FEUER [DE]); |