EP0852225 - FIBRINOGEN RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS AND MEDICINAL PREPARATIONS CONTAINING THE SAME AS THE ACTIVE INGREDIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-3 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-71 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/28] | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-3 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-71 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYASHI, Yoshio, Nippon Steel Corporation Advanced Techno. Res. Labs., 1618 Ida, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | 02 /
HARADA, Takeo, Nippon Steel Corporation Advanced Techno. Res. Labs, 1618, Ida, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 1 / JP | 03 /
TACHIKI, Akira, Nippon Steel Corporation Advanced Techno. Res. Labs., 1618 Ida, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 11 / JP | 04 /
KATADA, Jun, Nippon Steel Corporation Advanced Techno. Res. Labs., 1618 Ida, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | [1998/28] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/28] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97928513.7 | 27.06.1997 | [1998/28] | WO1997JP02252 | Priority number, date | JP19960167982 | 27.06.1996 Original published format: JP 16798296 | [1998/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9749682 | Date: | 31.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/57] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0852225 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0852225 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.12.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07D211/34, C07D401/12, C07D417/12, A61K31/445, A61K31/495, A61K31/55, C07D211/46 | [1998/38] | CPC: |
C07D405/06 (EP);
C07D211/34 (EP,KR);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D207/06 (KR);
C07D211/46 (EP);
C07D211/74 (EP);
C07D259/00 (KR);
C07D265/30 (KR);
C07D277/04 (KR);
C07D279/12 (KR);
C07D295/067 (KR);
C07D401/12 (KR);
C07D403/12 (KR);
C07D413/12 (KR);
|
Former IPC [1998/28] | C07D211/34, C07D211/62, C07D295/18, C07D295/20, C07D401/12, C07D417/12, A61K31/445, A61K31/495 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1998/28] | Title | German: | FIBRINOGEN- REZEPTOR- ANTAGONISTEN UND MEDIZINISCHE ZUBEREITUNGEN DIE DIESE ALS AKTIVEN BESTANDTEIL ENTHALTEN | [1998/28] | English: | FIBRINOGEN RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS AND MEDICINAL PREPARATIONS CONTAINING THE SAME AS THE ACTIVE INGREDIENT | [1998/28] | French: | ANTAGONISTES DE RECEPTEUR DE FIBRINOGENE, ET PREPARATION MEDICINALE CONTENANT CES ANTAGONISTES EN TANT QU'INGREDIENT ACTIF | [1998/28] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.1998 | Translation filed | 24.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.1998 | Search fee paid | 24.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/28] | 03.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.10.2002 | BE | 30.10.2002 | NL | 30.10.2002 | DE | 31.01.2003 | GB | 27.06.2003 | ES | 28.06.2003 | SE | 28.06.2003 | CH | 30.06.2003 | LI | 30.06.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/45] | AT | 30.10.2002 | |
BE | 30.10.2002 | ||
NL | 30.10.2002 | ||
DE | 31.01.2003 | ||
GB | 27.06.2003 | ||
SE | 28.06.2003 | ||
CH | 30.06.2003 | ||
LI | 30.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 30.10.2002 | |
BE | 30.10.2002 | ||
NL | 30.10.2002 | ||
DE | 31.01.2003 | ||
SE | 28.06.2003 | ||
CH | 30.06.2003 | ||
LI | 30.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | AT | 30.10.2002 | |
BE | 30.10.2002 | ||
NL | 30.10.2002 | ||
DE | 31.01.2003 | ||
SE | 28.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | AT | 30.10.2002 | |
BE | 30.10.2002 | ||
NL | 30.10.2002 | ||
DE | 31.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/51] | AT | 30.10.2002 | |
BE | 30.10.2002 | ||
NL | 30.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 30.10.2002 | |
NL | 30.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 30.10.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0445796 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [X] 1-9 * claim 1 *; | [DA]WO9215607 (SEARLE & CO [US]) [DA] 1-9* claim 1 *; | [PX]WO9620172 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP], et al) [PX] 1-9 * claim 1 *; | [PX] - HARADA T ET AL, "Development of the new potent non-peptide GpIIb/IIIa antagonist NSL-95301 by utilizing combinatorial technique", BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT. (BMCLE8,0960894X);97; VOL.7 (2); PP.209-212, LIFE SCIENCE RESEARCH CENTER NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION;ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY RESEARCH LABORATORIES; KAWASAKI; 211; JAPAN (JP), XP000618322 [PX] 1-9 * examples 12,18 * | International search | [A]JPH04217652 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]); | [AP]WO9620172 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP], et al) |