EP0966290 - WATER-BASED MAKEUP COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR THEIR PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2002 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E-L Management Corp. 767 Fifth Avenue New York, NY 10153 / US | [1999/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DACUNHA, Kathleen 117 Butternut Lane Stamford, CT 06903 / US | 02 /
MCKENNA, Linda 10 Bluebell Lane North Babylon, New York 11703 / US | 03 /
CHANT, David 258 Gerritsen Avenue Bayport, NY 11705 / US | 04 /
JENNINGS, Deborah 74 Rutgers Lane Huntington, NY 11743 / US | [2000/04] |
Former [1999/52] | 01 /
DACUNHA, Kathleen 117 Butternut Lane Stamford, CT 06903 / US | ||
02 /
MCKENNA, Linda 10 Bluebell Lane Stamford, CT 06903 / US | |||
03 /
CHANT, David 258 Gerritsen Avenue Bayport, NY 11705 / US | |||
04 /
JENNINGS, Deborah 74 Rutgers Lane Huntington, NY 11743 / US | Representative(s) | Horner, Martin Grenville Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/52] | Horner, Martin Grenville Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 97928885.9 | 09.06.1997 | [1999/52] | WO1997US09836 | Priority number, date | US19960661250 | 10.06.1996 Original published format: US 661250 | [1999/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9747309 | Date: | 18.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/54] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0966290 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.12.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/74, A61K7/02, A61K7/00 | [1999/52] | CPC: |
A61Q1/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/11 (EP,US);
A61K8/14 (EP,US);
A61K8/894 (EP,US);
A61K2800/412 (EP,US);
A61K2800/43 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/52] | Title | German: | SCHMINKE AUF WASSEBASIS UND DER HERSTELLUNGPROZESS | [1999/52] | English: | WATER-BASED MAKEUP COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR THEIR PREPARATION | [1999/52] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE MAQUILLAGE A BASE D'EAU ET LEURS PROCEDES DE FABRICATION | [1999/52] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.1998 | Search fee paid | 16.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/52] | 29.04.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9205761 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1-14,16,17,27 * claims 1,5,8,17,21-23,25 * * page 13, line 20 - page 14, line 27 ** page 17, lines 28-31 * | International search | [Y]US5256422 (ALBERT ELIZABETH C [US], et al) |