EP0907623 - REFRACTORY COMPOSITE MATERIALS PROTECTED AGAINST OXIDISING AT HIGH TEMPERATURE, PRECURSORS OF THE SAID MATERIALS, THEIR PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMUNAUTE EUROPEENNE DE L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE (EURATOM) Bâtiment Jean Monnet-DG XIII/A1 Plateau du Kirchberg L-2920 Luxembourg / LU | [1999/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUPEL, Pascal Houtdraaierstraat 34 NL-1825 AM Alkmaar / NL | 02 /
VEYRET, Jean-Bernard Oranjelaan 23 NL-1862 EZ Bergen / NL | [1999/15] | Representative(s) | Le Roux, Martine, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/15] | Le Roux, Martine, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 97929361.0 | 16.06.1997 | [1999/15] | WO1997FR01084 | Priority number, date | LU19960088773 | 19.06.1996 Original published format: LU 88773 | [1999/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9748663 | Date: | 24.12.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0907623 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0907623 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C04B41/86 | [1999/15] | CPC: |
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/4556 (EP,US);
C04B41/5022 (EP,US);
C04B41/81 (EP,US);
C04B41/86 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2918 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B35/806, C04B41/009 (EP);
C04B41/009, C04B35/565 (US,EP);
C04B41/009, C04B35/584 (US,EP);
C04B41/009, C04B35/597 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/15] | Title | German: | GEGEN OXIDATION BEI HÖHEREN TEMPERATUREN GESCHÜTZTE FEUERFESTE VERBUNDMATERIALIEN, VORLÄUFER DIESER MATERIALIEN UND IHRE HERSTELLUNG | [2002/43] | English: | REFRACTORY COMPOSITE MATERIALS PROTECTED AGAINST OXIDISING AT HIGH TEMPERATURE, PRECURSORS OF THE SAID MATERIALS, THEIR PREPARATION | [1999/15] | French: | MATERIAUX COMPOSITES REFRACTAIRES PROTEGES CONTRE L'OXYDATION A HAUTE TEMPERATURE, PRECURSEURS DESDITS MATERIAUX, LEURS PREPARATIONS | [1999/15] |
Former [1999/15] | GEGEN OXIDATION BEI HÖHEREN TEMPERATUREN GESCHÜTZTE FEUERFESTE VERBUNDMATERIALIEN, VORLÄUFERN DIESER MATERIALIEN UND IHRE HERSTELLUNG | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/15] | 21.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.04.2003 | FI | 23.04.2003 | GB | 23.04.2003 | IE | 23.04.2003 | IT | 23.04.2003 | NL | 23.04.2003 | LU | 16.06.2003 | BE | 30.06.2003 | DK | 23.07.2003 | GR | 23.07.2003 | PT | 23.07.2003 | SE | 23.07.2003 | DE | 24.07.2003 | ES | 30.10.2003 | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/17] | AT | 23.04.2003 | |
FI | 23.04.2003 | ||
GB | 23.04.2003 | ||
IE | 23.04.2003 | ||
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
LU | 16.06.2003 | ||
BE | 30.06.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
DE | 24.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2007/04] | AT | 23.04.2003 | |
FI | 23.04.2003 | ||
GB | 23.04.2003 | ||
IE | 23.04.2003 | ||
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
LU | 16.06.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
DE | 24.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 23.04.2003 | |
FI | 23.04.2003 | ||
GB | 23.04.2003 | ||
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
LU | 16.06.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
DE | 24.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 23.04.2003 | |
FI | 23.04.2003 | ||
GB | 23.04.2003 | ||
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
DE | 24.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 23.04.2003 | |
FI | 23.04.2003 | ||
GB | 23.04.2003 | ||
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 23.04.2003 | |
FI | 23.04.2003 | ||
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 23.04.2003 | |
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 23.04.2003 | |
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | NL | 23.04.2003 | |
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | NL | 23.04.2003 | |
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | SE | 23.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3811928 (HENNEY J, et al) [A] * abstract *; | [A]DE2540015 (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK) [A] * claim 1 *; | [A]US4457958 (LANGE FREDERICK F [US], et al) [A] 1,2,6,9 * abstract * * column 1, line 52 - line 58 *; | [A]EP0282386 (AEROSPATIALE [FR]) [A] * abstract * |