EP0906709 - MOBILE RADIOTELEPHONY TERMINAL WITH CONTROLLED UTILISATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sagem SA 6, Avenue d'Iéna 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/14] | For all designated states SAGEM SA 6, Avenue d'Iéna 75116 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALOS, Rafael 10 bis rue des Tulipes 95520 OSNY / FR | 02 /
DIMECH, Jean-Marc 55, clos de la Vigne F-60240 Chaumont en Vexin / FR | 03 /
PORATO, Marc 5, impasse des Gaziers F-60240 Loconville / FR | 04 /
SYKES, Francis 3 Villa Coeur de Vey F-75014 Paris / FR | [1999/34] |
Former [1999/22] | 01 /
ALOS, Rafael 31 Centre Ravinière F-95520 Osny / FR | ||
02 /
DIMECH, Jean-Marc 55, clos de la Vigne F-60240 Chaumont en Vexin / FR | |||
03 /
PORATO, Marc 5, impasse des Gaziers F-60240 Loconville / FR | |||
04 /
SYKES, Francis 3 Villa Coeur de Vey F-75014 Paris / FR | |||
Former [1999/14] | 01 /
ALOS, Rafa[l 31 Centre Ravinière F-95520 Osny / FR | ||
02 /
DIMECH, Jean-Marc 55, clos de la Vigne F-60240 Chaumont en Vexin / FR | |||
03 /
PORATO, Marc 5, impasse des Gaziers F-60240 Loconville / FR | |||
04 /
SYKES, Francis 3 Villa Coeur de Vey F-75014 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | Bloch, Gérard, et al Gevers France 41, Avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/14] | Bloch, Gérard, et al 2, square de l'Avenue du Bois 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97929366.9 | 17.06.1997 | [1999/14] | WO1997FR01089 | Priority number, date | FR19960007697 | 20.06.1996 Original published format: FR 9607697 | [1999/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9749256 | Date: | 24.12.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0906709 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0906709 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/32 | [1999/14] | CPC: |
H04W88/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/14] | Title | German: | MOBILES FUNKTELEFONGERÄT MIT KONTROLLIERTER BENUTZUNG | [1999/14] | English: | MOBILE RADIOTELEPHONY TERMINAL WITH CONTROLLED UTILISATION | [1999/14] | French: | TERMINAL DE RADIO-TELEPHONIE MOBILE A UTILISATION CONTROLEE | [1999/14] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/14] | 12.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2001 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.08.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.09.2004 | FI | 29.09.2004 | IE | 29.09.2004 | IT | 29.09.2004 | NL | 29.09.2004 | DK | 29.12.2004 | GR | 29.12.2004 | SE | 29.12.2004 | ES | 09.01.2005 | PT | 28.02.2005 | LU | 17.06.2005 | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/29] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
LU | 17.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 29.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0301740 (NOKIA MOBIRA OY [FI]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 19 - line 42 * * column 3, line 50 - line 54 *; | [A]GB2234883 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,5* abstract *; | [A]EP0448369 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1,5 * column 2, line 45 - line 49 * * column 4, line 10 - line 36 * * column 4, line 52 - line 56 *; | [A]DE9217379U (ERICSSON) [A] 1-4 * page 5, line 24 - line 32 * * page 6, line 10 - page 7, line 10 * * page 7, line 36 - page 8, line 4 *; | [A]DE4242151 (DETECON GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-4; | [XA]EP0639486 (ALCATEL MOBILE COMM FRANCE [FR]) [X] 1 * claims 1,4 * * column 7, line 43 - line 54 * * column 5, line 5 - line 50 * [A] 2,3 |