EP0848588 - AN IMPLEMENT FOR AUTOMATICALLY MILKING ANIMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2002 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.2002 [2002/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAASLAND N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | [1998/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DEN BERG, Karel Boterbloemstraat 5 NL-2971 BR Bleskensgraaf / NL | 02 /
FRANSEN, René Prins Hendriklaan 6 NL-3135 ZD Vlaardingen / NL | [1998/26] | Representative(s) | Corten, Maurice Jean F.M., et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Cornelis van der Lelylaan 1 3147 PB Maassluis / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/48] | Corten, Maurice Jean F.M., et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | ||
Former [1998/26] | Mulder, Herman Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | Application number, filing date | 97929567.2 | 01.07.1997 | [1998/26] | WO1997NL00370 | Priority number, date | EP19960201881 | 05.07.1996 Original published format: EP 96201881 | [1998/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9801022 | Date: | 15.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0848588 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0848588 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A01J5/017, A01K1/12 | [1998/26] | CPC: |
A01J5/0175 (EP,US);
A01K1/126 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1998/26] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN MELKEN VON TIEREN | [1998/26] | English: | AN IMPLEMENT FOR AUTOMATICALLY MILKING ANIMALS | [1998/26] | French: | INSTALLATION DE TRAITE AUTOMATIQUE D'ANIMAUX | [1998/26] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/26] | 23.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01100039.5 / EP1084610 | EP01100040.3 / EP1084611 | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]SU1484333 ; | [X]EP0213660 (MULTINORM BV [NL]) [X] 1 * figure 1 *; | [X]EP0313109 (LELY NV C VAN DER [NL]) [X] 1 * column 5, line 39 - column 6, line 19; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0519544 (LELY NV C VAN DER [NL]) [A] 1,2* figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0630558 (TEXAS INDUSTRIES INC [AN]) [A] 1,22 * column 9, line 15 - line 41; figure - *; | [XA]EP0689762 (MAASLAND NV [NL]) [X] 25 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 40; figure - * [A] 1,24; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 50, Database accession no. 89-369035, XP002041890 & SU1484333 A 19890607 (N-CAUC CATTLE RES I) [X] 1,26 * abstract * |