blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0979465

EP0979465 - A RELATIONAL DATABASE SYSTEM CONTAINING A MULTIDIMENSIONAL HIERARCHICAL MODEL OF INTERRELATED SUBJECT CATEGORIES WITH RECOGNITION CAPABILITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.03.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company
1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900
Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company
1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900
Annandale NJ 08801-0900 / US
Former [2001/01]For all designated states
ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company
1545 Route 22 East, Clinton Township
Annandale, New Jersey 08801 / US
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY
P.O.Box 390, 180 Park Avenue
Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US
Inventor(s)01 / UNGER, Sandra, S.
36 Terry Drive
Convent Station, NJ 07961 / US
02 / PAGNUCCO, Sibylle
49 France Drive
Somerville, NJ 08876 / US
03 / COHEN, Roger, W.
100 Rocktown Road
Lambertville, NJ 08530 / US
04 / FIATO, Rocco, A.
27 Wexford Way
Basking Ridge, NJ 07920 / US
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Dew, Melvyn John, et al
ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc.
IP Law Europe
Hermeslaan 2
1831 Machelen / BE
[N/P]
Former [2001/04]Dew, Melvyn John, et al
ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. Law Technology P.O.Box 105
1830 Machelen / BE
Former [2000/07]Somers, Harold Arnold, et al
ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd., Patents & Licences, Mailpoint 70, Esso House, Ermyn Way
Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB
Application number, filing date97929800.704.06.1997
[2000/07]
WO1997US09729
Priority number, dateUS1996065526204.06.1996         Original published format: US 655262
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9746958
Date:11.12.1997
Language:EN
[1997/53]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979465
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US11.12.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.08.2000
ClassificationIPC:G06F17/30
[2000/07]
CPC:
G06F16/30 (EP,US); Y10S707/929 (US); Y10S707/954 (US);
Y10S707/956 (US); Y10S707/957 (US); Y10S707/99945 (US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2000/07]
TitleGerman:RELATIONELLES DATENBANKSYSTEM MIT EINEM MULTIDIMENSIONALEN UND HIERARCHISCHEN MODELL VON MITEINANDER VERBUNDENEN GEGENSTANDS-KATEGORIEN MIT ERKENNUNGSFÄHIGKEITEN[2000/07]
English:A RELATIONAL DATABASE SYSTEM CONTAINING A MULTIDIMENSIONAL HIERARCHICAL MODEL OF INTERRELATED SUBJECT CATEGORIES WITH RECOGNITION CAPABILITIES[2000/07]
French:SYSTEME DE BASE DE DONNES RELATIONNELLES COMPORTANT UN MODELE HIERARCHIQUE MULTIDIMENSIONNEL DE CATEGORIES D'OBJETS CORRELATIFS AVEC FONCTIONS DE RECONNAISSANCE[2000/07]
Entry into regional phase24.12.1998National basic fee paid 
24.12.1998Search fee paid 
24.12.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
24.12.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.01.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
24.12.1998Examination requested  [2000/07]
06.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.10.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/18]
19.11.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
29.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
06.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
07.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0694857  (IBM [US]) [X] 1-4,7 * abstract * * page 2, line 53 - page 3, line 48 *;
 [A]  - NUYTS A, "A new dimension in patent indexing and searching. The use of navigation tools", WORLD PATENT INFORMATION,GB,ELSEVIER SCIENCES PUBLISHING, BARKING, (19960601), vol. 18, no. 2, ISSN 0172-2190, page 111, XP004037730 [A] 1,8 * the whole document *
 [A]  - DINTZNER J -P ET AL, "IMAGE HANDLING AT THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE: BACON AND FIRST PAGE", WORLD PATENT INFORMATION,GB,ELSEVIER SCIENCES PUBLISHING, BARKING, (1991), vol. 13, no. 3, ISSN 0172-2190, pages 152 - 154, XP000537436 [A] 1,8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0172-2190(91)90070-L
 [A]  - OPPENHEIM C ET AL, "An Evaluation of the Patent View CD-ROM Database", WORLD PATENT INFORMATION,GB,ELSEVIER SCIENCES PUBLISHING, BARKING, (19950301), vol. 17, no. 1, ISSN 0172-2190, pages 9 - 20, XP004037813 [A] 1,8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0172-2190(94)00049-R
International search[A]US5142674  (BARKER BARBARA A [US], et al);
 [A]US5283894  (DERAN ROGER L [US]);
 [A]US5511186  (CARHART RAYMOND E [US], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.