EP0906703 - INTEGRATED VOICE, FACSIMILE AND ELECTRONIC MAIL MESSAGING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2006 | Refusal of application | published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cranberry Properties, LLC 22000 Aol Way Dulles, VA 20166 / US | [2005/29] |
Former [1999/14] | For all designated states COMPUSERVE INCORPORATED 5000 Arlington Centre Boulevard Columbus, OH 43220 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OWENS, Stephen, J., H. 5837 Tuttles Grove Boulevard Dublin, OH 43017 / US | 02 /
FINNEY, Michael, S. 2885 Bohlen Drive Hilliard, OH 43026 / US | 03 /
SNIDER, Michael, L. 1078 Blind Brook Drive Columbus, OH 43235 / US | 04 /
WRIGHT, Randall, S. 290 Bryant Avenue Worthington, OH 43085 / US | 05 /
PAYNTER, James, W. 3327 Darby Glen Boulevard Hilliard, OH 43026 / US | 06 /
BARD, Robin, R. 2896 Sawdust Lane Dublin, OH 43017 / US | [1999/14] | Representative(s) | Thielmann, Andreas Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Postfach 10 18 30 40009 Dusseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/14] | Thielmann, Andreas Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Postfach 33 02 29 40435 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 97930053.0 | 18.06.1997 | [1999/14] | WO1997US10441 | Priority number, date | US19960665564 | 18.06.1996 Original published format: US 665564 | [1999/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9749251 | Date: | 24.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0906703 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.12.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04N11/00, H04N1/00, H04N1/32 | [2000/11] | CPC: |
H04L51/066 (EP,US);
H04L51/214 (EP,US);
H04L51/224 (EP,US);
H04L51/56 (EP,US);
H04M3/53 (EP,US);
H04M3/5307 (EP,US);
H04N1/00209 (EP,US);
H04N1/324 (EP,US);
H04N1/32406 (EP,US);
H04N1/32416 (EP,US);
H04N1/32432 (EP,US);
H04M2203/4509 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1999/14] | H04N11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/14] | Extension states | AL | 16.01.1999 | LT | 16.01.1999 | LV | 16.01.1999 | RO | 16.01.1999 | SI | 16.01.1999 | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTES SPRACH-, FAX- UND E-MAIL-NACHRICHTENSYSTEM | [1999/14] | English: | INTEGRATED VOICE, FACSIMILE AND ELECTRONIC MAIL MESSAGING SYSTEM | [1999/14] | French: | SYSTEME DE MESSAGERIE INTEGREE PAR COURRIER ELECTRONIQUE, TELECOPIE ET BOITE VOCALE | [1999/14] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.1999 | Search fee paid | 16.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.01.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 21.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/43] | 20.10.2003 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 04.07.2006 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/43] | Appeal following examination | 20.12.2003 | Appeal received No. T0371/04 | 27.02.2003 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.07.2006 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 04.07.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US4837798 (COHEN ROBERTA S [US], et al); | [X]US5193110 (JONES SCOTT A [US], et al); | [X]US5333266 (BOAZ WADE [US], et al); | [X]US5349636 (IRRIBARREN ROBERTO [US]); | [Y]US5487100 (KANE JOHN R [US]) |