blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0906216

EP0906216 - BEARING SUPPORT STRUCTURE FOR A TURRET IN MOORING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ITS INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.03.2002
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip22.03.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.05.2002  [2002/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FMC CORPORATION
200 East Randolph Drive Chicago
Illinois 60601 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/14]For all designated states
FMC CORPORATION
200 East Randolph Drive
Chicago Illinois 60601 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BOATMAN, Terry, L.
12515 Whispering Sands Court
Houston, TX 77041 / US
[1999/29]
Former [1999/14]01 / BOATMAN, Terry, L.
15885 Memorial Drive 307
Houston, TX 77079 / US
Representative(s)Hanna, Peter William Derek
Hanna Moore + Curley
Garryard House
25/26 Earlsfort Terrace
Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2001/12]Hanna, Peter William Derek
Peter Hanna Associates 11 Mespil Road
Dublin 4 / IE
Former [1999/14]Hanna, Peter William Derek
Tomkins & Co., 5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Application number, filing date97930112.413.06.1997
[1999/14]
WO1997US10609
Priority number, dateUS19960019595P17.06.1996         Original published format: US 19595 P
US1997087024706.06.1997         Original published format: US 870247
[1999/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9748595
Date:24.12.1997
Language:EN
[1997/55]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0906216
Date:07.04.1999
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1999/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0906216
Date:16.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US24.12.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:B63B21/50, B63B22/02
[2000/01]
CPC:
B63B21/507 (EP,US); F16C19/381 (EP,US); F16C35/06 (EP,US);
F16C19/505 (EP,US); F16C2300/14 (EP,US); F16C2326/00 (EP,US);
F16C2326/30 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [1999/14]B63B21/50
Designated contracting statesDK,   GB,   MC,   NL [1999/14]
TitleGerman:AUFLAGERSTRUKTUR FÜR EINEN VERANKERUNGSDREHTURM UND EINBAUVERFAHREN HIERFÜR[1999/14]
English:BEARING SUPPORT STRUCTURE FOR A TURRET IN MOORING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ITS INSTALLATION[1999/14]
French:STRUCTURE DE SURFACE D'APPUI POUR TOURELLE D'AMARRAGE FUNICULAIRE ET PROCEDE D'INSTALLATION[1999/14]
Entry into regional phase14.12.1998National basic fee paid 
14.12.1998Search fee paid 
14.12.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
14.12.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.11.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
14.12.1998Examination requested  [1999/14]
14.12.1998Request for accelerated examination filed
17.01.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.01.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
23.05.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.08.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.11.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.02.2001Fee for grant paid
08.02.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.02.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
05.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]US5356321  (BOATMAN L TERRY [US], et al);
 [A]US4305341  (STAFFORD DONALD C)
by applicantUS5356321
 US19960019595
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.