EP0939119 - TRANSMEMBRANE TRAPPING METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2004 [2004/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 4-7, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8514 / JP | For all designated states Nakauchi, Hiromitsu 429-3, ohi, kukizakimachi Inashiki-gun Ibaraki 300-12 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/35] | For all designated states FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 4-7, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8514 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nakauchi, Hiromitsu 429-3, ohi, kukizakimachi Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki 300-12 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAUCHI, Hiromitsu 429-3, Ohi, Kukizakimachi Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki 300-12 / JP | 02 /
NAKAMURA, Yukio 4-22-1-203, Matsushiro Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305 / JP | 03 /
MIYOSHI, Sousuke 2-25-10-404, Matsushiro Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305 / JP | 04 /
KIM, Dong, Ku 1-2-302, Kasuga Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305 / JP | [1999/35] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/35] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal Patentanwälte - European Patent Attorneys, Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 97930840.0 | 18.07.1997 | [1999/35] | WO1997JP02502 | Priority number, date | JP19960192644 | 23.07.1996 Original published format: JP 19264496 | [1999/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9803645 | Date: | 29.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0939119 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.01.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/10, C12N15/12, C12N5/16, C07K14/435 | [1999/35] | CPC: |
C12N15/1051 (EP,US);
C07K14/705 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/35] | Title | German: | KLONIEREN VON PROTEINE WELCHE MEMBRANPROTEINE KODIEREN | [1999/35] | English: | TRANSMEMBRANE TRAPPING METHODS | [1999/35] | French: | TECHNIQUES DE PIEGEAGE TRANSMEMBRANAIRE | [1999/35] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.1998 | Translation filed | 04.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.1999 | Search fee paid | 04.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 04.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/35] | 05.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/48] | 21.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0607054 (HONJO TASUKU [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * examples 1-3 *; | [X] - FOXWELL B M J ET AL, "CYTOKINE RECEPTORS: STRUCTURE AND SIGNAL TRANSDUCTION", CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL IMMUNOLOGY, OXFORD, GB, (1992), vol. 90, ISSN 0009-9104, pages 161 - 169, XP000940611 [X] 7-10 * page 162 - page 164; figure 1 * | [A] - KLEIN R D ET AL, "SELECTION FOR GENES ENCODING SECRETED PROTEINS AND RECEPTORS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (19960709), vol. 93, no. 14, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 7108 - 7113, XP002061411 [A] 1-10 * page 7108; tables 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.93.14.7108 | International search | [A] - TASHIRO K., ET AL., "SIGNAL SEQUENCE TRAP: A CLONING STRATEGY FOR SECRETED PROTEINS AND TYPE I MEMBRANE PROTEINS.", Science, American Association for the Advancement of Science, US, US, (19930730), vol. 261., doi:10.1126/science.8342023, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 600 - 603., XP000673204 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.8342023 | [A] - SEED B., ARUFFO A., "Molecular cloning of the CD2 anigen, the T-cell erythrocyte receptor, by a rapid immunoselection procedure", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, National Academy of Sciences, US, US, (19870501), vol. 84., doi:10.1073/pnas.84.10.3365, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 3365 - 3369., XP002098062 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.84.10.3365 |