Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000513449 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | SE9602638 | 03.07.1996 | SE9701187 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU728791B | Global Dossier | 18.01.2001 | B2 | AU3471697 | 21.01.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | SE9602638 | 03.07.1996 | SE9701187 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1007956 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE9602638 | 03.07.1996 | SE9701187 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6322682 | 27.11.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | SE9602638 | 03.07.1996 | SE9701187 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9800709 | Global Dossier | 08.01.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE9602638 | 03.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2259503 | 08.01.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE9602638 | 03.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE9602638D0 | 03.07.1996 | D0 | Priority number | Date | SE9602638 | 03.07.1996 |