EP1007956 - AN IMPROVED METHOD FOR THE CAPILLARY ELECTROPHORESIS OF NUCLEIC ACIDS, PROTEINS AND LOW MOLECULAR CHARGED COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2007 [2007/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gyros AB Uppsala Science Park 751 83 Uppsala / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Gyros AB Uppsala Science Park 75183 Uppsala / SE | ||
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states Amersham Pharmacia Biotech AB 751 82 Uppsala / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARVIDSSON, Lars-Erik Per Borglins väg 1 S-237 41 Bjärred / SE | 02 /
EKSTRÖM, Björn Järpvägen 27 S-756 53 Uppsala / SE | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2001/43] |
Former [2000/24] | Rollins, Anthony John Group Patents, Amersham International plc, White Lion Road Amersham, Bucks HP7 9LL / GB | Application number, filing date | 97930965.5 | 01.07.1997 | [2000/24] | WO1997SE01187 | Priority number, date | SE19960002638 | 03.07.1996 Original published format: SE 9602638 | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9800709 | Date: | 08.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1007956 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 08.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/447 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
G01N27/44704 (EP,US);
G01N27/44752 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/24] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES VERFAHREN ZUR KAPILLARELEKTROTORESE VON NUCLEINSÄUREN, PROTEINEN UND NIEDERMOLEKULAREN VERBINDUNGEN | [2000/24] | English: | AN IMPROVED METHOD FOR THE CAPILLARY ELECTROPHORESIS OF NUCLEIC ACIDS, PROTEINS AND LOW MOLECULAR CHARGED COMPOUNDS | [2000/24] | French: | PROCEDE AMELIORE POUR ELECTROPHORESE CAPILLAIRE DES ACIDES NUCLEIQUES, DES PROTEINES ET DES COMPOSES A BAS POIDS MOLECULAIRE | [2000/24] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 29.12.1998 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 01.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/31] | 08.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   02.10.1999 | 31.07.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.08.2000 | 31.07.2006 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0708329 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]); | [A]US4690749 (VAN ALSTINE JAMES M [US], et al); | [A]US5447617 (SHIEH CHIA-HUI [US]); | [A]US5282941 (ROSE JR DONALD J [US]); | [A]US5322608 (KARGER BARRY L [US], et al) |