EP0904198 - Three-layer Polyamide Film Structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/13] | MULTILAYER POLYAMIDE FILM STRUCTURES | ||
[2004/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2005 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PLIANT CORPORATION 1475 Woodfield Road, Suite 700 Schaumburg, IL 60173 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/35] | For all designated states Pliant Corporation 1475 Woodfield Road, Suite 700 Schaumburg, IL 60173 / US | ||
Former [1999/13] | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSAI, Mingliang, Lawrence 7 Babera Drive Holmdel, NJ 07733 / US | 02 /
ALTMAN, Carl, Elliot R.D. 1, Box 118C Pitman, PA 17964 / US | 03 /
DEGRASSI, Alfieri P.O. Box 564 Pottsville, PA 17901 / US | 04 /
MENNIG, John R.D. 1, Box 1165 Pottsville, PA 17901 / US | 05 /
MESSA, Anthony, Francis 11 Scenic Falls Road Long Valley, NJ 07853 / US | [1999/13] | Representative(s) | Hucker, Charlotte Jane Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | Hucker, Charlotte Jane Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 97931131.3 | 10.06.1997 | [1999/13] | WO1997US10161 | Priority number, date | US19960019584P | 10.06.1996 Original published format: US 19584 P | US19970865945 | 30.05.1997 Original published format: US 865945 | [1999/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9747468 | Date: | 18.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/54] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0904198 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0904198 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/32, B32B27/34 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (US);
B32B27/34 (EP,US);
B32B2307/514 (US);
B32B2377/00 (US);
Y10T428/31725 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31931 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1999/13] | Title | German: | Dreischichtfoliestrukturen aus Polyamid | [2004/21] | English: | Three-layer Polyamide Film Structure | [2004/21] | French: | Structure de complexes polyamidiques à trois couches | [2004/21] |
Former [1999/13] | MEHRSCHICHTFOLIESTRUKTUREN AUS POLYAMID | ||
Former [1999/13] | MULTILAYER POLYAMIDE FILM STRUCTURES | ||
Former [1999/13] | STRUCTURES DE COMPLEXES POLYAMIDIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/13] | 06.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/45] | Request for further processing for: | 21.03.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 21.03.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.04.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2132395 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND) [X] 1,2,4-9,12,16 * page 3, line 22 - line 31 * * page 4, line 12 - line 14 * * example 12 *; | [X]US4058647 (INOUE TAKAYUKI, et al) [X] 1,2,4-9,12,13,16,24 * claim 1 * * see table in column 4; column 2, line 1 - line 54 *; | [X]EP0035392 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-9,12,13,16,24 * page 5, line 3 - page 6, line 14 * * page 14, line 5 - line 14 * * page 12, line 25 - line 30 * * claim - *; | [A]US4361628 (KRUEGER DUANE A, et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [DA]US4444829 (BOLLEN P STUART [US], et al) [DA] 1* claim 1 *; | [X]EP0334293 (VISKASE CORP [US]) [X] 1,7 * claim - *; | [A]EP0342897 (COURTAULDS FILMS & PACKAGING [GB]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]US5114765 (INADA JUN [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 47 - line 55; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0595220 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP], et al) [X] 1-14,16,24 * page 5, line 25 - page 6, line 14; claims 7,10 * | Examination | JPH07148897 | - Carlowitz B.: "Kunststoff-Tabellen", 4th. ed. (1995); Carl Hanser Verlag, München; p. 2-5 |