EP0906687 - METHOD AND AUDIO SERVER SYSTEM FOR AN UNRELIABLE NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/14] | AUDIO SERVER SYSTEM FOR AN UNRELIABLE NETWORK | ||
[2004/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2006 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.04.2006 [2006/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/14] | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOLOSKY, William, J. 24622 S.E. Mirrormont Drive Issaquah, WA 98027 / US | 02 /
LEVI, Steven, P. 16612 N.E. 41st Street Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 03 /
VAN ANTWERP, Mark, D. 115 34th Avenue E. Seattle, WA 98112 / US | 04 /
BERNET, Yoram 4525 1st Avenue N.E. Seattle, WA 98105 / US | [1999/14] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/14] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97931303.8 | 19.06.1997 | [1999/14] | WO1997US10759 | Priority number, date | US19960667095 | 19.06.1996 Original published format: US 667095 | [1999/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9749224 | Date: | 24.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0906687 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0906687 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/50, H04L29/06 | [1999/14] | CPC: |
H04L65/80 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04N7/17336 (EP,US);
H04L65/1101 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/14] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND AUDIO-SERVER-SYSTEM FÜR EIN UNZUVERLÄSSIGES NETZWERK | [2004/29] | English: | METHOD AND AUDIO SERVER SYSTEM FOR AN UNRELIABLE NETWORK | [2004/29] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE SERVEUR AUDIO DESTINE A UN RESEAU PEU FIABLE | [2004/29] |
Former [1999/14] | AUDIO-SERVER-SYSTEM FÜR EIN UNZUVERLÄSSIGES NETZWERK | ||
Former [1999/14] | AUDIO SERVER SYSTEM FOR AN UNRELIABLE NETWORK | ||
Former [1999/14] | SYSTEME DE SERVEUR AUDIO DESTINE A UN RESEAU PEU FIABLE | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/14] | 23.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   13.09.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0674414 (AVID TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [A] 1-24 * column 7, line 2 - line 26 ** column 9, line 53 - column 11, line 27 *; | [Y]WO9617451 (PROGRESSIVE NETWORKS [US]) [Y] 1-8,10-13,20 * abstract * * figures 2A-2D; claims 3,13 * * page 7, line 5 - line 30 * * page 8, line 11 - line 25 * * page 17, line 3 - line 23 * * page 20, line 15 - page 21, line 30 * * page 24, line 13 - line 18 * * page 28, line 11 - line 35 *; | [Y]WO9617306 (ORACLE CORP [US]) [Y] 1-8,10-13,20 * page 12, paragraph 5 - page 15, paragraph 5 * * page 32, paragraph 4 - page 33, paragraph 3 *; | [E]WO9722201 (CAMPBELL ROY H [US], et al) [E] 1,4-12,15,16,19-23 * abstract * * page 19, line 10 - page 23, line 7 * * claims 1,5 *; | [A] - "MULTIMEDIA AUDIO ON DEMAND", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (199406), vol. 37, no. 6B, pages 451 - 460, XP000616888 [A] 1-3,13,17 * the whole document * | [A] - LOUGHER P ET AL, "THE IMPACT OF DIGITAL AUDIO AND VIDEO ON HIGH-SPEED STORAGE", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SYMPOSIUM ON MASS STORAGE SYSTEMS, TOWARDS DISTRIBUTED STORAGE AND DATA MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS ANNECY, JUNE 12 - 16, 1994, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19940612), no. SYMP. 13, pages 84 - 89, XP000493022 [A] 1,7,8,12,15,16,19-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MASS.1994.373037 | [A] - BOLOT J -C ET AL, "CONTROL MECHANISMS FOR PACKET AUDIO IN THE INTERNET", PROCEEDINGS OF IEEE INFOCOM 1996. CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS, FIFTEENTH ANNUAL JOINT CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE COMPUTER AND COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETIES. NETWORKING THE NEXT GENERATION SAN FRANCISCO, MAR. 24 - 28, 1996, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19960324), vol. 1, pages 232 - 239, XP000622315 [A] 2,3,13,14,17,18,24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/INFCOM.1996.497898 |