EP0908009 - ROM-BASED FINITE IMPULSE RESPONSE FILTER FOR USE IN MOBILE TELEPHONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2010/28] |
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | ||
Former [1999/15] | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 6455 Lusk Boulevard San Diego, California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EASTON, Kenneth, D. 7379 Calle Cristobal 217 San Diego, CA 92126 / US | 02 /
BLACK, Peter, J. 8558 Villa La Jolla Drive 258 La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [1999/15] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/15] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing., et al WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97931357.4 | 23.06.1997 | [1999/15] | WO1997US10925 | Priority number, date | US19960672205 | 27.06.1996 Original published format: US 672205 | [1999/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9750174 | Date: | 31.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/57] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0908009 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0908009 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H03H17/06 | [1999/15] | CPC: |
H03H17/0607 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/15] | Title | German: | LESESPEICHERGESTÜTZTES FILTER MIT EINDLICHER IMPULSANTWORT FÜR MOBILTELEFON | [1999/15] | English: | ROM-BASED FINITE IMPULSE RESPONSE FILTER FOR USE IN MOBILE TELEPHONE | [1999/15] | French: | FILTRE A REPONSE IMPULSIONNELLE FINIE BASE SUR UNE MEMOIRE MORTE ET DESTINE AUX TELEPHONES MOBILES | [1999/15] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/15] | 24.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.11.2009 | 17.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.07.2010 | BE | 14.07.2010 | DK | 14.07.2010 | FI | 14.07.2010 | IT | 14.07.2010 | NL | 14.07.2010 | SE | 14.07.2010 | GR | 15.10.2010 | ES | 25.10.2010 | PT | 15.11.2010 | [2011/35] |
Former [2011/26] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IT | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US4817025 (ASAI SHIN [JP], et al) [Y] 1,3,4,6,8,9 * page 8, column 3, lines 1-32 * [A] 18,30,32; | [Y] - MAKEYAMA M., HIGUCHI T., PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON MULTIPLE VALUED LOGIC. EVANSTON, 1980., LONG BEACH, IEEE., US, US, (19800101), vol. SYMP. 10, pages 272 - 277., XP002043499 [Y] 1,3,4,6,8,9 * the whole document * | [A] - KEN POHLMANN, "SHIFTY CHARACTERS", AUDIO., PHILADELPHIA US, (198801), vol. 72, no. 1, page 40,44,46, XP002043498 [A] 28,29 * the whole document * | Examination | EP0492578 | - SODERSTRAND M.A.; TRUJILLO T.C.; CHOI H., "Flash-Memory Based Digital Filter and Baseband Modulator for FQPSK Transmitter", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 38TH MIDWEST SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, RIO DE JANEIRO, BRAZIL, 13-16 AUG. 1995, NEW YORK, NY, USA, (19950813), vol. 1, pages 358 - 361, XP010165142 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MWSCAS.1995.504451 |