EP0914726 - PROCESS FOR OPERATION OF TIME DIVISION MULTIPLE ACCESS (TDMA) RADIO SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/19] | PROCESS AND ARRANGEMENT FOR OPERATION OF TIME DIVISION MULTIPLE ACCESS (TDMA) RADIO SYSTEMS | ||
[2001/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.2002 [2002/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/19] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PILLEKAMP, Klaus-Dieter Galileistrasse 4 D-40699 Erkrath / DE | [1999/19] | Application number, filing date | 97931689.0 | 30.06.1997 | [1999/19] | WO1997DE01369 | Priority number, date | DE1996130048 | 25.07.1996 Original published format: DE 19630048 | [1999/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9805131 | Date: | 05.02.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0914726 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0914726 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26 | [1999/19] | CPC: |
H04W56/0035 (EP);
H04W56/002 (EP);
H04W92/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB VON TDMA-FUNKSYSTEMEN | [2001/05] | English: | PROCESS FOR OPERATION OF TIME DIVISION MULTIPLE ACCESS (TDMA) RADIO SYSTEMS | [2001/05] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE FAIRE FONCTIONNER DES SYSTEMES RADIO A ACCES MULTIPLE PAR REPARTITION DANS LE TEMPS | [2001/05] |
Former [1999/19] | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUM BETRIEB VON TDMA-FUNKSYSTEMEN | ||
Former [1999/19] | PROCESS AND ARRANGEMENT FOR OPERATION OF TIME DIVISION MULTIPLE ACCESS (TDMA) RADIO SYSTEMS | ||
Former [1999/19] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE FAIRE FONCTIONNER DES SYSTEMES RADIO A ACCES MULTIPLE PAR REPARTITION DANS LE TEMPS | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/19] | 30.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/33] | Request for further processing for: | 14.02.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 08.02.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.02.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB2249922 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,4,6,7 * page 6, line 3 - page 8, line 24 * * page 10, line 16 - page 11, line 22 *; | [A]EP0671825 (SEL ALCATEL AG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * column 2, line 3 - line 13 ** column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 8 *; | [Y] - YOSHIHIKO AKAIWA ET AL, "AUTONOMOUS DECENTRALIZED INTER-BASE-STATION SYNCHRONIZATION FOR TDMA MICROCELLULAR SYSTEMS", GATEWAY TO THE FUTURE - TECHNOLOGY IN MOTION, ST. LOUIS, MAY 19 - 22, 1991, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19910519), no. CONF. 41, pages 257 - 262, XP000260188 [Y] 1,4,6,7 * page 258, column 1, line 17 - line 27 * |