EP0910444 - DEVICE FOR EXTRACTING FRESH WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2002 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schuster, Christoph Feuerbacher Heide 61 70192 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/17] | Representative(s) | Schuster, Gregor Patentanwälte Schuster & Thul Wiederholdstrasse 10 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | Schuster, Gregor, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Schuster & Thul Wiederholdstrasse 10 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 97931703.9 | 03.07.1997 | [1999/17] | WO1997DE01403 | Priority number, date | DE1996126758 | 03.07.1996 Original published format: DE 19626758 | [1999/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9801202 | Date: | 15.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0910444 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B01D1/00, C02F1/14 | [1999/17] | CPC: |
C02F1/14 (EP);
C02F1/44 (EP);
Y02A20/124 (EP);
Y02A20/131 (EP);
Y02A20/142 (EP);
Y02A20/211 (EP);
Y02A20/212 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GR, IT, PT [1999/17] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUR SÜSSWASSERGEWINNUNG | [1999/17] | English: | DEVICE FOR EXTRACTING FRESH WATER | [1999/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'EXTRACTION D'EAU DOUCE | [1999/17] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/17] | 11.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/27] | 29.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.01.2000 | 31.07.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.01.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]FR2405221 (MADERN JEAN PIERRE [FR]) [X] 1,2,6,11,13,15 * page 1, lines 24-28; figure . * [Y] 3-5,7-10,12,14; | [PX]DE29521272U (SCHUSTER CHRISTOPH [DE]) [PX] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [YA]JPH02102777 ; | [YA]US4135985 (LA ROCCA ALDO) [Y] 5,7,8 * column 3, line 8 - column 4, line 47; figure - * [A] 1-4,6,9-15; | [YA]JPS5581777 ; | [YA]US4210494 (RHODES WILLIAM A [US]) [Y] 9,10 * abstract * [A] 1-8,11-15; | [YA]US3655517 (HENSLEY JUSTIN C JR, et al) [Y] 12 * column 3, lines 67-71; figure - * [A] 1-11,13-15 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900703), vol. 014, no. 306, Database accession no. (C - 0735), & JP02102777 A 19900416 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 3,4,14 * abstract * [A] 1,2,5-13,15 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800910), vol. 004, no. 129, Database accession no. (C - 024), & JP55081777 A 19800620 (KAJIMA CORP) [Y] 5 * abstract * [A] 1-4,6-15 |