EP0912818 - REGULATING VALVE FOR ENGINES OPERATED BY A MEDIUM UNDER PRESSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2002 [2002/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adevus Teknik AB P.O. Box 53171 400 15 Göteborg / SE | [1999/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NORBERG, Lars Valaasgatan 11 S-412 74 Göteborg / SE | 02 /
AIDEBORN, Hans Rödklövervägen 6 S-444 42 Stenungsund / SE | [1999/18] | Representative(s) | Inger, Lars Ulf Bosson, et al Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Gothenburg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | Inger, Lars Ulf Bosson, et al Göteborgs Patentbyra Dahls, Sjöporten 4 417 64 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 97932125.4 | 15.07.1997 | [1999/18] | WO1997SE01279 | Priority number, date | SE19960002771 | 15.07.1996 Original published format: SE 9602771 | [1999/18] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9802642 | Date: | 22.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0912818 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 22.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F01C21/16, // F01C13/02 | [1999/18] | CPC: |
F01C20/08 (EP,US);
F01C20/20 (EP,US);
F01C20/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/18] | Title | German: | VENTIEL ZUM REGELN VON DURCH EIN DRUCKMEDIUM ANGETRIEBENEN MOTOREN | [1999/18] | English: | REGULATING VALVE FOR ENGINES OPERATED BY A MEDIUM UNDER PRESSURE | [1999/18] | French: | SOUPAPE DE REGLAGE POUR MOTEURS ENTRAINES PAR UN MILIEU SOUS PRESSION | [1999/18] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.1998 | Translation filed | 29.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 29.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/18] | 06.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/37] | 10.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2002/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2000 | 31.07.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2001 | 31.07.2001 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0575301 (ATLAS COPCO TOOLS AB [SE]) |