EP0929655 - PROCESS FOR MAKING A DETERGENT COMPOSITION BY NON-TOWER PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/29] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEL GRECO, Angela, Gloria, Pres. Terrace 202 4-13-6, Shinohara Kitamachi, Nada-ku Kobe 657 / JP | 02 /
KANDASAMY, Manivannan 5-11, 501-2508, Koyocho-Naka, Higashinada-ku Kobe 658 / JP | [1999/29] | Representative(s) | Peet, Jillian Wendy, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/29] | Peet, Jillian Wendy, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Whitley Road, Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 97932153.6 | 05.06.1997 | [1999/29] | WO1997US09793 | Priority number, date | WO1996US15881 | 04.10.1996 Original published format: PCT/US96/15881 | [1999/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9814555 | Date: | 09.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0929655 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C11D11/00, C11D17/06 | [1999/29] | CPC: |
C11D11/0088 (EP);
C11D11/00 (EP);
C11D11/0082 (EP);
C11D11/02 (EP);
C11D17/0039 (EP);
C11D17/06 (EP);
C11D17/065 (EP);
C11D1/146 (EP);
C11D1/22 (EP);
C11D1/29 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/29] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON EINER WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG NACH OHNE-TURM-VERFAHREN | [1999/29] | English: | PROCESS FOR MAKING A DETERGENT COMPOSITION BY NON-TOWER PROCESS | [1999/29] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE COMPOSITION DETERGENTE SANS L'UTILISATION D'UNE TOUR | [1999/29] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/29] | 12.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2003/01] | 08.08.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4169806 (DAVIS JERRY E [US], et al) [A] 1 * examples V,VII *; | [A]US4992079 (LUTZ CHARLES W [US]) [A] 1,3,4,7,8,11 * example I; claims 1,4,5 *; | [A]US5554587 (CAPECI SCOTT W [US]) [A] 1-4,7,8 * column 7, line 9 - line 20 ** column 8, line 34 - column 9, line 30; example I; claims 1,6,7,10,11 * |