blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0909370

EP0909370 - REGENERATIVE PREHEATER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/16]LINEAR SCAN HOT SPOT DETECTION SYSTEM
[1999/24]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.12.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip29.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.02.2001 [2001/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABB AIR PREHEATER, INC.
Andover Road
Wellsville, NY 14895 / US
[1999/16]
Inventor(s)01 / BRZYTWA, Tadek Casimir
R.D. 1, Box 44
Wellsville, NY 14895 / US
02 / CAMPBELL, Barry, Edward
2430 Burt Hill Road
Canisteo, NY 14823 / US
[1999/16]
Representative(s)Miller, Toivo, et al
ABB Patent GmbH
Postfach 1140
68520 Ladenburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/16]Miller, Toivo, et al
ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 10 03 51
68128 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date97932250.023.06.1997
[1999/16]
WO1997US10876
Priority number, dateUS1996067436101.07.1996         Original published format: US 674361
[1999/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9800680
Date:08.01.1998
Language:EN
[1998/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0909370
Date:21.04.1999
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1999/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0909370
Date:01.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.01.1998
ClassificationIPC:F28F27/00, F28D19/04
[1999/16]
CPC:
F28F27/006 (EP,US); F28F27/00 (KR)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1999/16]
TitleGerman:REGENERATIVER VORWÄRMER[1999/24]
English:REGENERATIVE PREHEATER[1999/24]
French:PRECHAUFFEUR D'AIR A REGENERATION[1999/24]
Former [1999/16]LINEARES ABTASTSYSTEM ZUR ERFASSUNG HEISSER FLECKEN
Former [1999/16]LINEAR SCAN HOT SPOT DETECTION SYSTEM
Former [1999/16]SYSTEME DE DETECTION DE POINTS CHAUDS, A BALAYAGE LINEAIRE
Entry into regional phase11.12.1998National basic fee paid 
11.12.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.01.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.12.1998Examination requested  [1999/16]
31.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
31.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.11.1999Fee for grant paid
13.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[YA]JPH02170025  ;
 [Y]JPS6230914  ;
 [A]US3730259  (WIXSON D, et al) [A] 1,5* column 2, line 4 - column 3, line 25; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]WO9204589  (BADER EMIL [PT]) [A] 1,2 * page 6, line 12 - page 6, line 35; figures 1-3C *
 [YA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900918), vol. 014, no. 434, Database accession no. (P - 1107), & JP02170025 A 19900629 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 1 * abstract * [A] 6,7,9,14
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870707), vol. 011, no. 208, Database accession no. (P - 593), & JP62030914 A 19870209 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.