EP0996409 - Composition for delaying hair growth and corresponding use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/18] | METHODS FOR ALTERING HAIR GROWTH AND HAIR PIGMENTATION BY APOPTOSIS IN THE FOLLICULAR PAPILLAE AND COMPOSITIONS THEREFOR | ||
[2002/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC. Grandview Road Skillman New Jersey 08558-9418 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/18] | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. Grandview Road Skillman, New Jersey 08558-9418 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEIBERG, Miri 168 Herrontown Road Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | 02 /
SHAPIRO, Stanley, S. 10 Plymouth Drive Livingston, NJ 07039 / US | 03 /
CAUWENBERGH, Gerard, F., M., J. 10 Beechtree Lane Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | 04 /
WISNIEWSKI, Stephen, J. 6280 Pt. Pleasant Pike Doylestown, PA 18901 / US | [2000/18] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/18] | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97932281.5 | 25.06.1997 | [2000/18] | WO1997US11033 | Priority number, date | US19960021629P | 12.07.1996 Original published format: US 21629 P | [2000/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9802134 | Date: | 22.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0996409 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0996409 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/06 | [2000/18] | CPC: |
A61Q5/08 (EP);
A61K8/66 (EP,KR);
A61K8/14 (EP);
A61K8/375 (EP);
A61K8/39 (EP);
A61K8/494 (EP);
A61K8/63 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61Q7/00 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/18] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung zur Verzögerung des Haarwuchses und entsprechende Verwendung | [2002/23] | English: | Composition for delaying hair growth and corresponding use | [2002/23] | French: | Composition pour retarder la croissance des cheveux et l'utilisation correspondante | [2002/23] |
Former [2000/18] | VERFAHREN ZUM ÄNDERN DES HAARWACHSTUMS UND DER HAARPIGMENTATION DURCH APOPTOSE IN DIE FOLLIKULAREN PAPILLEN UND ZUSAMMENSTZUNG DAFÜR | ||
Former [2000/18] | METHODS FOR ALTERING HAIR GROWTH AND HAIR PIGMENTATION BY APOPTOSIS IN THE FOLLICULAR PAPILLAE AND COMPOSITIONS THEREFOR | ||
Former [2000/18] | PROCEDES POUR MODIFIER LA CROISSANCE CAPILLAIRE ET LA PIGMENTATION CAPILLAIRE PAR APOPTOSE DANS LES PAPILLES FOLLICULAIRES ET COMPOSITIONS PREVUES A CET EFFET | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.02.1999 | Examination requested [2000/18] | 20.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 23.04.2003 | AT | 25.06.2003 | FI | 25.06.2003 | IE | 25.06.2003 | PT | 25.06.2003 | BE | 30.06.2003 | DK | 31.07.2003 | [2008/29] |
Former [2008/23] | GR | 23.04.2003 | |
AT | 25.06.2003 | ||
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
IE | 25.06.2003 | ||
BE | 30.06.2003 | ||
DK | 31.07.2003 | ||
Former [2007/17] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
IE | 25.06.2003 | ||
BE | 30.06.2003 | ||
DK | 31.07.2003 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
IE | 25.06.2003 | ||
DK | 31.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 25.06.2003 | |
IE | 25.06.2003 | ||
DK | 31.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | FI | 25.06.2003 | |
IE | 25.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 25.06.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0079074 (AYUKAWA TAIZO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | JPH05276939 [ ] (NOEVIR KK) [ ] * abstract *; | [X]WO9325694 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [X] 1 * page 14, line 23 - line 32 * * page 17, line 26 - line 28 * * page 18, line 20 - line 31 *; | [PX]WO9625946 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [PX] 1 * page 23, line 29 - line 37 * * page 44, paragraph 1 *; | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19940214), vol. 120, no. 7, Database accession no. 75653, XP002046977 [A] 1 | [PA] - SEIBERG M ET AL, "Trypsin-induced follicular papilla apoptosis results in delayed hair growth and pigmentation.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, XP002046978 [PA] 1 | [ ] - DEVELOPMENTAL DYNAMICS, vol. 208, no. 4, pages 553 - 64 [ ] * abstract * |