Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0991941
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
24.05.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 10.07.2002 [2002/28] |
06.02.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
02.08.2001 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
04.07.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
25.02.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.04.2000 [2000/15] |
25.02.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.04.2000 [2000/15] |
04.02.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.04.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.03.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.02.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.02.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
10.02.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.03.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.03.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.12.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.08.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|