EP0991941 - MEASURING HEATING VALUE OF A GAS USING FLAMELESS COMBUSTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.07.2002 [2002/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTROMET, INC. 3731 Briar Park, Suite 100 Houston, Texas 77042 / US | [2000/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VANDER HEYDEN, William, H. 10331 North Westport Circle Mequon, WI 53092 / US | 02 /
BERG, Ronald, Arthur 2722 South 132 East Avenue Tulsa, OK 74134 / US | [2000/15] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/15] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Beier, Schöndorf und Mütschele Willy-Brandt-Strasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 97932292.2 | 25.06.1997 | [2000/15] | WO1997US11082 | Priority number, date | US19960682828 | 12.07.1996 Original published format: US 682828 | [2000/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9802739 | Date: | 22.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0991941 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/22 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
G01N25/22 (EP,US);
G01N33/22 (KR);
G01N33/225 (EP,US);
G01N25/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL [2000/15] | Title | German: | MESSUNG DES HEIZWERTES EINES GASES UNTER VERWENDUNG VON FLAMMLOSER VERBRENNUNG | [2000/15] | English: | MEASURING HEATING VALUE OF A GAS USING FLAMELESS COMBUSTION | [2000/15] | French: | MESURE DE LA VALEUR CHAUFFANTE D'UN GAZ AU MOYEN D'UNE COMBUSTION SANS FLAMME | [2000/15] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.03.1999 | Examination requested [2000/15] | 01.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/28] | 11.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.03.1999 | M01   Fee paid on   22.03.1999 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2001 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9010222 (PRECISION MEASUREMENT INC [US]) [A] 1,5,11,14,22,26 * the whole document *; | [DA]US4285245 (KENNEDY LYN R) [DA] 1,8,14,21 * column W *; | [A]US5012432 (STETTER JOSEPH R [US], et al) [A] 1,5,11,14,22,26 * column W *; | [A]US4386858 (KUDE WILLIAM B, et al) [A] 1,5,11,14,22,26 * column W * |