15.02.2008 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] |
25.10.2007 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
12.07.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.05.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.02.2007 |
Change: Reply to examination report |
|
13.02.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.12.2006 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.10.2006 |
First examination report |
|
17.10.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.09.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
19.07.2006 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.07.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.05.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.01.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.01.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.07.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.07.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.04.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
05.06.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.07.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
20.04.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
24.03.2000 |
Change - classification |
published on 10.05.2000 [2000/19] |
17.03.2000 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 03.05.2000 [2000/18] |
02.07.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
12.03.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.04.1999 [1999/17] |
12.03.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.04.1999 [1999/17] |
10.02.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.02.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.01.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.03.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.03.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.08.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|