EP0910884 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROL OF POWER SUPPLY COUPLINGS ON COMPUTER BACKPLANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2008 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Force Computers Inc. 2001 Logic Drive San Jose, CA 95124-3468 / US | [1999/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUMANN, Juergen Tegernseer Landstrasse 23 D-82008 Unterhaching / DE | 02 /
VADASZ, Istvan Alzstrasse 23 D-81549 München / DE | [1999/17] | Representative(s) | Baronetzky, Klaus, et al Splanemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | Baronetzky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Splanemann, Dr. B. Reitzner, Dipl.-Ing. K. Baronetzky Tal 13 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97932536.2 | 08.07.1997 | [1999/17] | WO1997US11840 | Priority number, date | US19960676706 | 08.07.1996 Original published format: US 676706 | [1999/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9801930 | Date: | 15.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0910884 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.01.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H02J1/00, H02J1/10, H02J3/00, G06F1/00, G11C8/00, H02H7/122, G06F1/32, H02J1/14 | [2000/19] | CPC: |
G11C5/143 (EP,US);
G06F1/305 (EP,US);
H02J1/14 (EP,US);
H02J9/061 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/17] | H02J1/00, H02J1/10, H02J3/00, G06F1/00, G11C8/00, H02H7/122 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG VON STROMVERSORGUNGSKOPPLUNGEN AUF EINER COMPUTERRÜCKWAND | [1999/17] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROL OF POWER SUPPLY COUPLINGS ON COMPUTER BACKPLANE | [1999/17] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE COMMANDE DE COUPLAGE DE BLOCS D'ALIMENTATION PLACES SUR LE PANNEAU ARRIERE D'UN ORDINATEUR | [1999/17] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.1999 | Search fee paid | 20.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/17] | 07.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/12] | 29.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5266838 (GERNER WILLIAM [US]); | [A]US5027002 (THORNTON ROGER D [US]) | International search | [X]US5588054 (SHIN SEONGKEE [KR], et al); | [A]US4868832 (MARRINGTON S PAUL [AU], et al); | [A]US5151907 (ROBBINS WALTER A [US]); | [A]US5184025 (MCCURRY PATRICK W [US], et al) |