EP0939810 - TRANSCRIPTIONAL INTERMEDIARY FACTOR-2 TIF2 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75654 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | For all designated states UNIVERSITE LOUIS PASTEUR 4, rue Blaise Pascal, Boite postale 1032F 67070 Strasbourg Cedex / FR | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75654 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | ||
For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris Cédex / FR | |||
For all designated states UNIVERSITE LOUIS PASTEUR 4, rue Blaise Pascal, Boite postale 1032F 67070 Strasbourg Cedex / FR | |||
For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton NJ 05843-4000 / US | |||
Former [2007/06] | For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75654 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | ||
For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris Cédex / FR | |||
For all designated states UNIVERSITE LOUIS PASTEUR 4, rue Blaise Pascal, Boite postale 1032F 67070 Strasbourg Cedex / FR | |||
For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 & Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US | |||
Former [1999/36] | For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75654 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | ||
For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE 3 rue Michel Ange 75794 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | |||
For all designated states Universite Louis Pasteur 4, rue Blaise Pascal, Boite postale 1032F 67070 Strasbourg Cedex / FR | |||
For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 & Provinceline Road Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAMBON, Pierre 4, rue A. Schweitzer F-67113 Blaesheim / FR | 02 /
GRONEMEYER, Hinrich Uhlandstrasse 1A D-77704 Oberkirch / DE | 03 /
VOEGEL, Johannes 2, rue du Cheval F-67100 Strasbourg / FR | 04 /
LUTZ, Yves 12, rue d'Ypres F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | [1999/36] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/36] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97932575.0 | 11.07.1997 | [1999/36] | WO1997US12100 | Priority number, date | US19960021247P | 12.07.1996 Original published format: US 21247 P | [1999/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9802455 | Date: | 22.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0939810 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0939810 | Date: | 07.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C07K14/47, C07K16/18, G01N33/566, G01N33/50 | [1999/36] | CPC: |
C07K14/4702 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/36] | Title | German: | TRANSKRIPTIONS ZWISCHEN FAKTOR-2 TIF2 | [1999/36] | English: | TRANSCRIPTIONAL INTERMEDIARY FACTOR-2 TIF2 | [1999/36] | French: | FACTEUR-2 INTERMEDIAIRE DE LA TRANSCRIPTION | [1999/36] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/36] | 12.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 22.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07101726.3 / EP1865060 | Opposition(s) | 08.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 07.02.2007 | NL | 07.02.2007 | GR | 08.05.2007 | PT | 09.07.2007 | [2008/21] |
Former [2008/08] | FI | 07.02.2007 | |
NL | 07.02.2007 | ||
PT | 09.07.2007 | Cited in | International search | [XD] - J.J. VOEGEL ET AL., "TIF2, a 160kDa transcriptional mediator for the ligand-dependent activation function AF-2 of nuclear receptors", THE EMBO JOURNAL, (1996), vol. 15, no. 14, pages 3667 - 3675, XP002045757 [XD] 1-20 * the whole document * | [AD] - S.A. OÑATE ET AL., "Sequence and characterization of a coactivator for the Steroid Hormone Receptor Superfamily", SCIENCE, (19951124), vol. 270, pages 1354 - 1357, XP002045755 [AD] * the whole document * | [A] - H. HONG ET AL., "GRIP1, a novel mouse protein that serves as a transcriptional coactivator in yeast for the hormone binding domains of steroid receptors.", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (199605), vol. 93, pages 4948 - 4952, XP002045756 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.93.10.4948 | [PXD] - H. HONG ET AL., "GRIP1, a transcriptional coactivator for the AF-2 transactivation domain of steroid, thyroid, retinoid, and vitamin D receptors", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (199705), vol. 17, no. 5, pages 2735 - 2744, XP002045758 [PXD] 1-20 * the whole document * | [PXD] - C.K. GLASS ET AL., "Nuclear receptor coactivators", CURRENT OPINION IN CELL BIOLOGY, (199704), vol. 9, no. 2, pages 222 - 232, XP002045759 [PXD] 1-20 * table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0955-0674(97)80066-X |