EP0914246 - COMPOSITE MAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.03.2005 [2005/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saffil Limited 381, Fulwood Road Sheffield, South Yorkshire S10 3GB / GB | [2000/04] |
Former [1999/19] | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DINWOODIE, John 9 Pineridge Close Spital, Wirral L62 2EE / GB | [1999/19] | Representative(s) | Shaw, Laurence, et al 5th Floor, Metropolitan House, 1 Hagley Road, Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8TG / GB | [1999/37] |
Former [1999/19] | Millross, Christopher Robert, et al Intellectual Property Department ICI Materials P.O. Box 90 Wilton Middlesbrough, Cleveland TS90 8JE / GB | Application number, filing date | 97932921.6 | 22.07.1997 | [1999/19] | WO1997GB01971 | Priority number, date | GB19960015720 | 26.07.1996 Original published format: GB 9615720 | [1999/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9804404 | Date: | 05.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0914246 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0914246 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/28, B32B19/06, // F01N3/02, F01N3/28, D04H1/64 | [1999/19] | CPC: |
B32B5/02 (EP);
B32B5/28 (KR);
B32B19/06 (US);
B32B7/12 (US);
D04H1/4209 (EP);
D04H1/4218 (EP);
D04H1/554 (EP);
D04H1/593 (EP);
D04H1/645 (EP);
D04H13/00 (EP);
B32B2262/105 (US);
B32B2307/308 (US);
B32B2471/04 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1999/19] | Title | German: | VERBUNDMATTE | [1999/19] | English: | COMPOSITE MAT | [1999/19] | French: | MATELAS COMPOSITE | [1999/19] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/19] | 27.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9323245 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1; | [Y]WO9424425 (CARBORUNDUM CO [US]) [Y] 1-19; | [Y]US4999168 (TEN EYCK JOHN D [US]) [Y] 1-19; | [A]EP0328293 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-8,13-19; | [A]EP0573834 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1; | [PY]WO9732118 (ICI PLC [GB], et al) [PY] 1-19; | [PA]WO9702413 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [PA] 1 |