EP0870588 - RESIN MOLDING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2005 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.01.2006 [2006/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS, LTD. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/42] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS, LTD. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIDE, Yasutaka 17-1101, 5-17, Nakagawara 1-chome Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510 / JP | 02 /
TANAHASHI, Yasunori 2453-5, Komono-cho Mie-gun, Mie 510-12 / JP | 03 /
HATTORI, Kazuo 1721-2, Ejima-cho Suzuka-shi, Mie 510-02 / JP | [1998/42] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [1998/42] | Application number, filing date | 97933030.5 | 25.07.1997 | [1998/42] | WO1997JP02592 | Priority number, date | JP19960196722 | 25.07.1996 Original published format: JP 19672296 | JP19960270428 | 14.10.1996 Original published format: JP 27042896 | JP19960272635 | 15.10.1996 Original published format: JP 27263596 | [1998/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9804395 | Date: | 05.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0870588 | Date: | 14.10.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0870588 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.02.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/02, B29C45/14, B29C45/28, H01L21/56, B29C45/18 | [2001/02] | CPC: |
B29C45/1808 (EP);
B29C45/02 (EP,KR);
B29C45/14 (KR);
B29C45/28 (KR);
B29C45/14655 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/42] | B29C45/02, B29C45/14, B29C45/28, H01L21/56 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1998/42] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM HARZFORMEN | [1998/42] | English: | RESIN MOLDING APPARATUS | [1998/42] | French: | APPAREIL DE MOULAGE DE RESINE | [1998/42] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.1998 | Translation filed | 21.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.1998 | Search fee paid | 21.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/42] | 31.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 22.10.2004 | [2006/03] | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]JPS60251635 (OSADA MICHIO); | [X]JPS5813457U |