Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3665838B | Global Dossier | 29.06.2005 | B2 | Priority number | Date | JP9702628 | 29.07.1997 | JP20083996 | 30.07.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU714249B | Global Dossier | 23.12.1999 | B2 | AU3635997 | 20.02.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | JP9702628 | 29.07.1997 | JP20083996 | 30.07.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0865729 | Global Dossier | 02.12.1998 | A4 | EP0865729 | 23.09.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP9702628 | 29.07.1997 | JP20083996 | 30.07.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO981413L | 28.05.1998 | L | NO981413D0 | 27.03.1998 | D0 | Priority number | Date | JP9702628 | 29.07.1997 | JP20083996 | 30.07.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6382134 | 07.05.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP9702628 | 29.07.1997 | JP20083996 | 30.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9804124 | Global Dossier | 05.02.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP20083996 | 30.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1198074 | 04.11.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | JP20083996 | 30.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR19990028620 | 15.04.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP20083996 | 30.07.1996 |