EP0928789 - 6-PHENYLTETRAHYDRO-1,3-OXAZIN-2-ONE DERIVATIVES AND MEDICINAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.09.2005 [2005/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nikken Chemicals Company, Limited 4-14, Tsukiji 5-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/28] | For all designated states Nikken Chemicals Company, Limited 4-14, Tsukiji 5-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INA, Shinji, Nikken Chemicals Co., Ltd. Omiya Research Lab., 346, Kitabukurocho 1-chome Omiya-shi, Saitama 330 / JP | 02 /
YAMANA, Kenjiro, Nikken Chemicals Co., Ltd. Omiya Research Lab., 346, Kitabukurocho 1-chome Omiya-shi, Saitama 330 / JP | 03 /
NODA, Kyoji, Nikken Chemicals Co., Ltd. Omiya Research Lab., 346, Kitabukurocho 1-chome Omiya-shi, Saitama 330 / JP | [1999/28] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/28] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97933853.0 | 30.07.1997 | [1999/28] | WO1997JP02654 | Priority number, date | JP19960216926 | 31.07.1996 Original published format: JP 21692696 | [1999/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9804534 | Date: | 05.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0928789 | Date: | 14.07.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0928789 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.02.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D265/10, C07D413/04, C07D417/04, A61K31/535, C07D413/12, C07D417/12 | [2001/45] | CPC: |
C07D413/04 (EP,US);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D265/10 (EP,US);
C07D413/06 (EP,US);
C07D413/12 (EP,US);
C07D417/04 (EP,US);
C07D417/12 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1999/28] | C07D265/10, C07D413/04, C07D417/04, A61K31/535 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1999/28] | Title | German: | 6-PHENYLTETRAHYDRO-1,3-OXAZIN-2-ON DERIVATE UND MEDIZINISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, DIE SIE ENTHALTEN | [1999/28] | English: | 6-PHENYLTETRAHYDRO-1,3-OXAZIN-2-ONE DERIVATIVES AND MEDICINAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THE SAME | [1999/28] | French: | DERIVES DE 6-PHENYLTETRAHYDRO-1,3-OXAZINE-2-ONE ET COMPOSITIONS MEDICINALES A BASE DE CES COMPOSES | [1999/28] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.1999 | Translation filed | 29.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.1999 | Search fee paid | 29.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 29.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/28] | 24.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]WO9412461 (PFIZER [US], et al) [YD] 1-10 * example 205 * * claim - *; | [Y]WO9115451 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PHARMA GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-10 * examples 3-5; claim - *; | [A]JPS62120374 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871114), vol. 011, no. 349, Database accession no. (C - 456), & JP62120374 A 19870601 (YOSHITOMI PHARMACEUT IND LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | International search | [A]US5459145 (SACCOMANO NICHOLAS A [US], et al) |